WI AB781 | 2009-2010 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 14-1-1)
Status: Engrossed on April 20 2010 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2010-04-28 - Failed to concur in pursuant to Senate Joint Resolution 1
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on April 20 2010 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2010-04-28 - Failed to concur in pursuant to Senate Joint Resolution 1
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
An Act to amend 36.27 (3n) (b) (intro.), 36.27 (3n) (bg), 36.27 (3p) (b), 38.24 (7) (b) (intro.), 38.24 (7) (bg) and 38.24 (8) (b); and to create 36.27 (3n) (bd), 36.27 (3p) (bd), 38.24 (7) (bd) and 38.24 (8) (bd) of the statutes; relating to: remission of fees for veterans and their dependents enrolled in the University of Wisconsin System or in a technical college.
Title
Remission of fees for veterans and their dependents enrolled in the University of Wisconsin System or in a technical college.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2010-04-28 | Failed to concur in pursuant to Senate Joint Resolution 1 | |
2010-04-27 | Fiscal estimate received | |
2010-04-21 | Read first time and referred to committee on Agriculture and Higher Education | |
2010-04-21 | Received from Assembly | |
2010-04-20 | Ordered immediately messaged | |
2010-04-20 | Read a third time and passed, Ayes 98, Noes 0 | |
2010-04-20 | Rules suspended | |
2010-04-20 | Ordered to a third reading | |
2010-04-20 | Assembly substitute amendment 1 adopted | |
2010-04-20 | Read a second time | |
2010-04-20 | Rules suspended to withdraw from committee on Finance and take up | |
2010-03-30 | Referred to joint committee on Finance | |
2010-03-30 | Report passage as amended recommended by committee on Veterans and Military Affairs, Ayes 9, Noes 0 | |
2010-03-30 | Report Assembly Substitute Amendment 1 adoption recommended by committee on Veterans and Military Affairs, Ayes 9, Noes 0 | |
2010-03-25 | Assembly substitute amendment 1 offered by committee on Veterans and Military Affairs | |
2010-03-25 | Executive action taken | |
2010-03-23 | Fiscal estimate received | |
2010-03-23 | Fiscal estimate received | |
2010-03-02 | Public hearing held | |
2010-03-02 | Representative Molepske Jr. added as a coauthor | |
2010-02-26 | Read first time and referred to committee on Veterans and Military Affairs | |
2010-02-26 | Introduced |
Wisconsin State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://docs.legis.wisconsin.gov/2009/proposals/reg/asm/bill/ab781 |
Text | https://docs.legis.wisconsin.gov/document/proposaltext/2009/REG/AB781.pdf |