WI AB760 | 2013-2014 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 29-15)
Status: Failed on April 8 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-04-08 - Failed to pass pursuant to Senate Joint Resolution 1
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 29-15)
Status: Failed on April 8 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-04-08 - Failed to pass pursuant to Senate Joint Resolution 1
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
An Act to create 20.380 (3) (dm) and 41.567 of the statutes; Relating to: a grant program to support creative industries, job creation, or economic development in this state and making an appropriation. (FE)
Title
A grant program to support creative industries, job creation, or economic development in this state and making an appropriation. (FE)
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2014-03-20 - House - Assembly: Refused to suspend rules to withdraw from committee on Rules and take up (Y: 39 N: 52 NV: 8 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2014-04-08 | House | Failed to pass pursuant to Senate Joint Resolution 1 |
2014-03-20 | House | Refused to suspend rules to withdraw from committee on Rules and take up, Ayes 39, Noes 52 |
2014-03-07 | House | Referred to Committee on Rules |
2014-03-07 | House | Report passage recommended by Committee on Tourism, Ayes 13, Noes 0 |
2014-02-25 | House | Executive action taken |
2014-02-19 | House | Public hearing held |
2014-02-17 | House | Fiscal estimate received |
2014-02-12 | House | Read first time and referred to Committee on Tourism |
2014-02-12 | House | Introduced |