WI AB759 | 2017-2018 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 12-0)
Status: Failed on March 28 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-03-28 - Failed to concur in pursuant to Senate Joint Resolution 1
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 12-0)
Status: Failed on March 28 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-03-28 - Failed to concur in pursuant to Senate Joint Resolution 1
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
An Act to create 409.109 (4) (n), chapter 420 and 421.202 (11) of the statutes; Relating to: regulation of rental-purchase agreements and granting rule-making authority. (FE)
Title
Regulation of rental-purchase agreements and granting rule-making authority. (FE)
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2018-02-20 - House - Assembly: Read a third time and passed (Y: 59 N: 35 NV: 4 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-03-28 | Senate | Failed to concur in pursuant to Senate Joint Resolution 1 |
2018-03-14 | Senate | Available for scheduling |
2018-03-14 | Senate | Read first time and referred to committee on Senate Organization |
2018-02-23 | Senate | Senate Amendment 1 offered by Senator Miller |
2018-02-21 | Senate | Received from Assembly |
2018-02-20 | House | Ordered immediately messaged |
2018-02-20 | House | Read a third time and passed, Ayes 59, Noes 35 |
2018-02-20 | House | Rules suspended |
2018-02-20 | House | Ordered to a third reading |
2018-02-20 | House | Assembly Substitute Amendment 1 adopted |
2018-02-20 | House | Assembly Amendment 7 to Assembly Substitute Amendment 1 adopted |
2018-02-20 | House | Assembly Amendment 7 to Assembly Substitute Amendment 1 offered by Representative Petryk |
2018-02-20 | House | Assembly Amendment 6 to Assembly Substitute Amendment 1 adopted |
2018-02-20 | House | Assembly Amendment 6 to Assembly Substitute Amendment 1 offered by Representative Kooyenga |
2018-02-20 | House | Assembly Amendment 5 to Assembly Substitute Amendment 1 adopted |
2018-02-20 | House | Assembly Amendment 5 to Assembly Substitute Amendment 1 offered by Representative Zimmerman |
2018-02-20 | House | Assembly Amendment 4 to Assembly Substitute Amendment 1 adopted |
2018-02-20 | House | Assembly Amendment 4 to Assembly Substitute Amendment 1 offered by Representative Pronschinske |
2018-02-20 | House | Assembly Amendment 3 to Assembly Substitute Amendment 1 adopted |
2018-02-20 | House | Assembly Amendment 3 to Assembly Substitute Amendment 1 offered by Representative Novak |
2018-02-20 | House | Assembly Amendment 2 to Assembly Substitute Amendment 1 withdrawn and returned to author |
2018-02-20 | House | Assembly Amendment 2 to Assembly Substitute Amendment 1 offered by Representative Petryk |
2018-02-20 | House | Assembly Amendment 1 to Assembly Substitute Amendment 1 withdrawn and returned to author |
2018-02-20 | House | Assembly Amendment 1 to Assembly Substitute Amendment 1 offered by Representative Petryk |
2018-02-20 | House | Read a second time |
2018-02-20 | House | Representative Sinicki withdrawn as a coauthor |
2018-02-15 | House | Made a special order of business at 1:42 PM on 2-20-2018 pursuant to Assembly Resolution 26 |
2018-02-15 | House | Referred to committee on Rules |
2018-02-15 | House | Report passage as amended recommended by Committee on Jobs and the Economy, Ayes 10, Noes 4 |
2018-02-15 | House | Report Assembly Substitute Amendment 1 adoption recommended by Committee on Jobs and the Economy, Ayes 12, Noes 1 |
2018-02-15 | House | Executive action taken |
2018-02-14 | House | Representative Sinicki added as a coauthor |
2018-02-14 | House | Assembly Substitute Amendment 1 offered by Representative Petryk |
2018-01-30 | House | Public hearing held |
2018-01-03 | House | Fiscal estimate received |
2017-12-19 | House | Read first time and referred to Committee on Jobs and the Economy |
2017-12-19 | House | Introduced |