WI AB737 | 2013-2014 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Failed on April 8 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-04-08 - Failed to pass pursuant to Senate Joint Resolution 1
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Failed on April 8 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-04-08 - Failed to pass pursuant to Senate Joint Resolution 1
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
An Act to amend 343.28 (1) and (2) and 345.48 (1m) and (2); and to create 20.395 (5) (fr), 345.11 (2r), 345.48 (5) and 345.62 of the statutes; Relating to: requiring the Department of Transportation to contract for driver improvement course services, forwarding by courts of traffic violation convictions, and making an appropriation. (FE)
Title
Requiring the Department of Transportation to contract for driver improvement course services, forwarding by courts of traffic violation convictions, and making an appropriation. (FE)
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2014-04-08 | House | Failed to pass pursuant to Senate Joint Resolution 1 |
2014-03-18 | House | Made a special order of business at 10:09 AM on 3-20-2014 pursuant to Assembly Resolution 28 |
2014-02-18 | House | Referred to Committee on Rules |
2014-02-18 | House | Report passage as amended recommended by Committee on Judiciary, Ayes 6, Noes 3 |
2014-02-18 | House | Report Assembly Amendment 4 adoption recommended by Committee on Judiciary, Ayes 6, Noes 3 |
2014-02-13 | House | Executive action taken |
2014-02-13 | House | Fiscal estimate received |
2014-02-12 | House | Assembly Amendment 4 offered by Representative J. Ott |
2014-02-12 | House | Assembly Amendment 3 offered by Representative Goyke |
2014-02-12 | House | Assembly Amendment 2 offered by Representative Goyke |
2014-02-12 | House | Assembly Amendment 1 offered by Representative Goyke |
2014-02-11 | House | Public hearing held |
2014-02-07 | House | Read first time and referred to Committee on Judiciary |
2014-02-07 | House | Introduced |
Wisconsin State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://docs.legis.wisconsin.gov/2013/proposals/reg/asm/bill/ab737 |
Text | https://docs.legis.wisconsin.gov/document/proposaltext/2013/REG/AB737.pdf |