WI AB734 | 2017-2018 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 26-0)
Status: Failed on March 28 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-03-28 - Failed to concur in pursuant to Senate Joint Resolution 1
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 26-0)
Status: Failed on March 28 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-03-28 - Failed to concur in pursuant to Senate Joint Resolution 1
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
An Act to create 71.05 (6) (b) 54., 71.26 (1) (i) and 71.45 (1) (d) of the statutes; Relating to: creating individual and corporate income and franchise tax deductions for tuition paid for apprenticeship programs. (FE)
Title
Creating individual and corporate income and franchise tax deductions for tuition paid for apprenticeship programs. (FE)
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-03-28 | Senate | Failed to concur in pursuant to Senate Joint Resolution 1 |
2018-02-16 | Senate | Read first time and referred to committee on Revenue, Financial Institutions and Rural Issues |
2018-02-16 | Senate | Received from Assembly |
2018-02-15 | House | Ordered immediately messaged |
2018-02-15 | House | Representative Skowronski added as a coauthor |
2018-02-15 | House | Read a third time and passed |
2018-02-15 | House | Rules suspended |
2018-02-15 | House | Ordered to a third reading |
2018-02-15 | House | Assembly Amendment 2 adopted |
2018-02-15 | House | Assembly Amendment 2 offered by Representatives Stafsholt and Billings |
2018-02-15 | House | Read a second time |
2018-02-13 | House | Made a special order of business at 1:07 PM on 2-15-2018 pursuant to Assembly Resolution 23 |
2018-02-13 | House | Referred to committee on Rules |
2018-02-13 | House | Report passage recommended by Joint Committee on Finance, Ayes 12, Noes 4 |
2018-02-13 | House | Executive action taken |
2018-01-25 | House | Referred to joint committee on Finance |
2018-01-25 | House | Report passage recommended by Committee on Workforce Development, Ayes 9, Noes 5 |
2018-01-16 | House | Executive action taken |
2018-01-16 | House | Assembly Amendment 1 offered by Representative Billings |
2018-01-10 | House | Public hearing held |
2017-12-22 | House | Fiscal estimate received |
2017-12-07 | House | Read first time and referred to Committee on Workforce Development |
2017-12-07 | House | Introduced |
Wisconsin State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://docs.legis.wisconsin.gov/2017/proposals/reg/asm/bill/ab734 |
Text | https://docs.legis.wisconsin.gov/document/proposaltext/2017/REG/AB734.pdf |