WI AB734 | 2013-2014 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 13-6)
Status: Passed on April 4 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-04-04 - Published 4-5-2014
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 13-6)
Status: Passed on April 4 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-04-04 - Published 4-5-2014
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
An Act Relating to: powers and duties of the board of veterans affairs; reimbursement of veterans' tuition at tribal colleges; documentation for eligibility to veterans homes; operation of veterans homes; eligibility and procedural requirements for veterans home loans, veterans personal loans, county veterans service grants, and American Indian veterans grants; and funeral honors, burial, and disinterment of veterans. (FE)
Title
Powers and duties of the board of veterans affairs; reimbursement of veterans' tuition at tribal colleges; documentation for eligibility to veterans homes; operation of veterans homes; eligibility and procedural requirements for veterans home loans, veterans personal loans, county veterans service grants, and American Indian veterans grants; and funeral honors, burial, and disinterment of veterans. (FE)
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2014-03-18 - Senate - Senate: Decision of the Chair stands as the judgement of the Senate (Y: 17 N: 15 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-02-18 - House - Assembly: Assembly Amendment 1 laid on table (Y: 58 N: 38 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-02-18 - House - Assembly: Assembly Amendment 1 laid on table (Y: 58 N: 38 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2014-04-04 | House | Published 4-5-2014 |
2014-04-04 | House | Report approved by the Governor on 4-4-2014. 2013 Wisconsin Act 189 |
2014-04-03 | House | Presented to the Governor on 4-3-2014 |
2014-03-26 | House | Report correctly enrolled on 3-26-2014 |
2014-03-26 | House | LRB correction |
2014-03-18 | House | Received from Senate concurred in |
2014-03-18 | Senate | Ordered immediately messaged |
2014-03-18 | Senate | Read a third time and concurred in |
2014-03-18 | Senate | Rules suspended |
2014-03-18 | Senate | Ordered to a third reading |
2014-03-18 | Senate | Decision of the Chair stands as the judgement of the Senate, Ayes 17, Noes 15 |
2014-03-18 | Senate | Point of order that Senate Amendment 1 was not germane well taken |
2014-03-18 | Senate | Read a second time |
2014-03-18 | Senate | Senate Amendment 1 offered by Senators Lassa, Hansen, Carpenter, L. Taylor, Vinehout, Harris, Shilling, Lehman, Miller, T. Cullen, Wirch, Risser and C. Larson |
2014-03-14 | Senate | Placed on calendar 3-18-2014 pursuant to Senate Rule 18(1) |
2014-03-07 | Senate | Available for scheduling |
2014-03-07 | Senate | Report concurrence recommended by Committee on Transportation, Public Safety, and Veterans and Military Affairs, Ayes 5, Noes 0 |
2014-03-06 | Senate | Executive action taken |
2014-02-27 | Senate | Public hearing held |
2014-02-19 | Senate | Read first time and referred to committee on Transportation, Public Safety, and Veterans and Military Affairs |
2014-02-19 | Senate | Received from Assembly |
2014-02-18 | House | Ordered immediately messaged |
2014-02-18 | House | Read a third time and passed |
2014-02-18 | House | Rules suspended |
2014-02-18 | House | Ordered to a third reading |
2014-02-18 | House | Assembly Amendment 1 laid on table, Ayes 58, Noes 38 |
2014-02-18 | House | Assembly Amendment 1 offered by Representatives Vruwink, Ringhand and Sinicki |
2014-02-18 | House | Read a second time |
2014-02-13 | House | Placed on calendar 2-18-2014 by Committee on Rules |
2014-02-13 | House | Referred to Committee on Rules |
2014-02-13 | House | Report passage recommended by Committee on Veterans, Ayes 14, Noes 2 |
2014-02-12 | House | Executive action taken |
2014-02-12 | House | Public hearing held |
2014-02-12 | House | Representative Ballweg added as a coauthor |
2014-02-11 | House | Fiscal estimate received |
2014-02-06 | House | Read first time and referred to Committee on Veterans |
2014-02-06 | House | Introduced |