WI AB714 | 2015-2016 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 4-0)
Status: Passed on March 31 2016 - 100% progression
Action: 2016-03-31 - Published 3-31-2016
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 4-0)
Status: Passed on March 31 2016 - 100% progression
Action: 2016-03-31 - Published 3-31-2016
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
An Act to renumber and amend 66.0615 (1) (f); to amend 66.0615 (1m) (d) 8.; and to create 66.0615 (1) (f) 1. and 66.0615 (1) (f) 2. of the statutes; Relating to: changes affecting tourism entities under the room tax.
Title
Changes affecting tourism entities under the room tax.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2016-03-31 | House | Published 3-31-2016 |
2016-03-31 | House | Report approved by the Governor on 3-30-2016. 2015 Wisconsin Act 301 |
2016-03-29 | House | Presented to the Governor on 3-29-2016 |
2016-03-23 | House | Report correctly enrolled on 3-23-2016 |
2016-03-16 | House | Received from Senate concurred in |
2016-03-15 | Senate | Ordered immediately messaged |
2016-03-15 | Senate | Read a third time and concurred in |
2016-03-15 | Senate | Rules suspended |
2016-03-15 | Senate | Ordered to a third reading |
2016-03-15 | Senate | Read a second time |
2016-03-14 | Senate | Placed on calendar 3-15-2016 pursuant to Senate Rule 18(1) |
2016-03-14 | Senate | Public hearing requirement waived by committee on Senate Organization, pursuant to Senate Rule 18 (1m), Ayes 3, Noes 2 |
2016-02-17 | Senate | Available for scheduling |
2016-02-17 | Senate | Read first time and referred to committee on Senate Organization |
2016-02-17 | Senate | Received from Assembly |
2016-02-16 | House | Ordered immediately messaged |
2016-02-16 | House | Representative Spreitzer added as a coauthor |
2016-02-16 | House | Read a third time and passed |
2016-02-16 | House | Rules suspended |
2016-02-16 | House | Ordered to a third reading |
2016-02-16 | House | Read a second time |
2016-02-16 | House | Rules suspended to withdraw from calendar and take up |
2016-02-11 | House | Placed on calendar 2-16-2016 by Committee on Rules |
2016-02-08 | House | Referred to committee on Rules |
2016-02-08 | House | Report passage recommended by Committee on Tourism, Ayes 13, Noes 0 |
2016-02-03 | House | Executive action taken |
2016-01-27 | House | Public hearing held |
2016-01-28 | House | Representative Loudenbeck added as a coauthor |
2016-01-27 | House | Representative Kitchens added as a coauthor |
2016-01-19 | House | Representative Murphy added as a coauthor |
2016-01-13 | House | Read first time and referred to Committee on Tourism |
2016-01-13 | House | Introduced |