WI AB681 | 2013-2014 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 22-4)
Status: Failed on April 8 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-04-08 - Failed to pass pursuant to Senate Joint Resolution 1
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 22-4)
Status: Failed on April 8 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-04-08 - Failed to pass pursuant to Senate Joint Resolution 1
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
An Act to create 893.16 (5) (d), 893.575 and 895.438 of the statutes; Relating to: creating a civil cause of action for victims of commercial sexual exploitation.
Title
Creating a civil cause of action for victims of commercial sexual exploitation.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2014-04-08 | House | Failed to pass pursuant to Senate Joint Resolution 1 |
2014-03-07 | House | Referred to Committee on Rules |
2014-03-07 | House | Report passage as amended recommended by Committee on Criminal Justice, Ayes 10, Noes 0 |
2014-03-07 | House | Report Assembly Amendment 1 adoption recommended by Committee on Criminal Justice, Ayes 10, Noes 0 |
2014-02-20 | House | Executive action taken |
2014-02-04 | House | Assembly Amendment 1 offered by Representative Billings |
2014-01-30 | House | Public hearing held |
2014-01-28 | House | Read first time and referred to Committee on Criminal Justice |
2014-01-28 | House | Introduced |
Wisconsin State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://docs.legis.wisconsin.gov/2013/proposals/reg/asm/bill/ab681 |
Text | https://docs.legis.wisconsin.gov/document/proposaltext/2013/REG/AB681.pdf |