WI AB672 | 2023-2024 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 15-2)
Status: Failed on April 15 2024 - 100% progression
Action: 2024-04-15 - Failed to pass pursuant to Senate Joint Resolution 1
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 15-2)
Status: Failed on April 15 2024 - 100% progression
Action: 2024-04-15 - Failed to pass pursuant to Senate Joint Resolution 1
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
An Act to renumber and amend 341.13 (5); and to create 341.13 (1m) and 341.13 (5) (b) of the statutes; Relating to: indicia of registration for electric vehicles. (FE)
Title
Indicia of registration for electric vehicles. (FE)
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-04-15 | House | Failed to pass pursuant to Senate Joint Resolution 1 |
2024-02-26 | House | Fiscal estimate received |
2024-02-01 | House | Representative Emerson withdrawn as a coauthor |
2024-01-30 | House | Public hearing held |
2023-11-27 | House | Read first time and referred to Committee on Transportation |
2023-11-27 | House | Introduced |