WI AB669 | 2013-2014 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 6-0)
Status: Passed on April 8 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-04-08 - Published 4-9-2014
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 6-0)
Status: Passed on April 8 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-04-08 - Published 4-9-2014
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
An Act to amend 13.92 (4) (c), 13.92 (4) (d), 13.92 (4) (e), 13.92 (4) (f), 35.93 (2) (b) 4., 35.93 (2) (c) 1., 35.93 (3), 35.93 (3) (e) (intro.), 35.93 (3) (e) 1., 227.01 (13) (intro.), 227.11 (2) (intro.), 227.27 (2) and 442.01 (2); and to create 13.92 (4) (bm) and 227.265 of the statutes; Relating to: rule-making procedures and practice standards for certified public accountants.
Title
Rule-making procedures and practice standards for certified public accountants.
Sponsors
Sen. Howard Marklein [R] | Sen. Dale Kooyenga [R] | Rep. John Klenke [R] | Sen. Chris Kapenga [R] |
Rep. Daniel LeMahieu [R] | Sen. Glenn Grothman [R] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2014-04-08 | House | Published 4-9-2014 |
2014-04-08 | House | Report approved by the Governor on 4-8-2014. 2013 Wisconsin Act 210 |
2014-04-07 | House | Presented to the Governor on 4-7-2014 |
2014-04-02 | House | Report correctly enrolled on 4-2-2014 |
2014-04-02 | House | LRB correction (Assembly Amendment 2) |
2014-03-18 | House | Received from Senate concurred in |
2014-03-18 | Senate | Ordered immediately messaged |
2014-03-18 | Senate | Read a third time and concurred in |
2014-03-18 | Senate | Rules suspended |
2014-03-18 | Senate | Ordered to a third reading |
2014-03-18 | Senate | Read a second time |
2014-03-14 | Senate | Placed on calendar 3-18-2014 pursuant to Senate Rule 18(1) |
2014-03-14 | Senate | Public hearing requirement waived by committee on Senate Organization, pursuant to Senate Rule 18 (1m), Ayes 5, Noes 0 |
2014-02-12 | Senate | Available for scheduling |
2014-02-12 | Senate | Read first time and referred to committee on Senate Organization |
2014-02-12 | Senate | Received from Assembly |
2014-02-11 | House | Ordered immediately messaged |
2014-02-11 | House | Read a third time and passed |
2014-02-11 | House | Rules suspended |
2014-02-11 | House | Ordered to a third reading |
2014-02-11 | House | Assembly Amendment 2 adopted |
2014-02-11 | House | Assembly Amendment 1 adopted |
2014-02-11 | House | Read a second time |
2014-02-06 | House | Placed on calendar 2-11-2014 by Committee on Rules |
2014-02-06 | House | Referred to Committee on Rules |
2014-02-06 | House | Report passage as amended recommended by Committee on Ways and Means, Ayes 10, Noes 0 |
2014-02-06 | House | Report Assembly Amendment 2 adoption recommended by Committee on Ways and Means, Ayes 10, Noes 0 |
2014-02-06 | House | Report Assembly Amendment 1 adoption recommended by Committee on Ways and Means, Ayes 10, Noes 0 |
2014-02-06 | House | Executive action taken |
2014-02-06 | House | Public hearing held |
2014-02-05 | House | Assembly Amendment 2 offered by Representative Marklein |
2014-01-27 | House | Withdrawn from committee on State Affairs and Government Operations and referred to committee on Ways and Means pursuant to pursuant to Assembly Rule 42 (3)(c) |
2014-01-24 | House | Assembly Amendment 1 offered by Representative Kooyenga |
2014-01-24 | House | Read first time and referred to Committee on State Affairs and Government Operations |
2014-01-24 | House | Introduced |