WI AB668 | 2023-2024 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 17-8)
Status: Failed on April 15 2024 - 100% progression
Action: 2024-04-15 - Failed to pass pursuant to Senate Joint Resolution 1
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 17-8)
Status: Failed on April 15 2024 - 100% progression
Action: 2024-04-15 - Failed to pass pursuant to Senate Joint Resolution 1
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
An Act to amend 15.405 (6) (b), 36.61 (1) (b), 36.61 (3) (a), 36.61 (5) (b) 1., 36.61 (8) (c) 3., 146.81 (1) (c), 146.89 (1) (r) 1., 146.89 (1) (r) 5., 146.89 (3) (b) 8., 146.89 (3m) (intro.), 146.997 (1) (d) 3., 155.01 (7), 252.14 (1) (ar) 3., 257.01 (5) (a), 257.01 (5) (b), 440.094 (1) (c) 3., 447.02 (1) (a), 447.02 (1) (b), 447.02 (2) (a), 447.02 (3) (a) (intro.), 447.02 (3) (a) 2., 447.02 (3) (b), 447.02 (5), 447.03 (3) (c), 447.06 (1), 447.06 (2) (a) 3., 447.06 (2) (b), 447.06 (2) (c) (intro.), 447.06 (2) (c) 2. (intro.), 447.063, 447.065, 447.07 (1), 447.07 (3) (intro.), 447.07 (3) (e) to (h), 447.40 (intro.), 447.40 (6), 448.03 (2) (a), 448.975 (2) (c) 1., 450.03 (1) (e), 450.10 (3) (a) 4., 462.02 (2) (d), 462.04, 463.10 (5), 463.12 (5), 632.87 (4), 895.48 (1m) (a) (intro.), 895.48 (1m) (a) 2. and 941.315 (5); and to create 36.61 (1) (ak), 440.03 (13) (b) 20m., 440.08 (2) (a) 25m., 447.01 (6g), 447.01 (6r), 447.02 (1) (g), 447.02 (3) (a) 3., 447.02 (6), 447.03 (1m), 447.03 (3) (am), 447.04 (1m), 447.05 (2m), 447.057, 447.06 (1m), 447.06 (3) and 447.07 (6) of the statutes; Relating to: licensure of dental therapists; extending the time limit for emergency rule procedures; providing an exemption from emergency rule procedures; providing an exemption from rule-making procedures; and granting rule-making authority. (FE)
Title
Licensure of dental therapists; extending the time limit for emergency rule procedures; providing an exemption from emergency rule procedures; providing an exemption from rule-making procedures; and granting rule-making authority. (FE)
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-04-15 | House | Failed to pass pursuant to Senate Joint Resolution 1 |
2024-01-16 | House | Laid on the table |
2024-01-16 | House | Representatives Gustafson and O'Connor added as coauthors |
2024-01-11 | House | Placed on calendar 1-16-2024 by Committee on Rules |
2024-01-11 | House | Referred to committee on Rules |
2024-01-11 | House | Report passage recommended by Committee on Health, Aging and Long-Term Care, Ayes 16, Noes 0 |
2024-01-10 | House | Representative Drake added as a coauthor |
2024-01-10 | House | Executive action taken |
2023-12-28 | House | Fiscal estimate received |
2023-12-12 | House | Representative Baldeh added as a coauthor |
2023-12-07 | House | Senator Cabral-Guevara added as a cosponsor |
2023-11-17 | House | Representative Schutt added as a coauthor |
2023-11-15 | House | Public hearing held |
2023-11-14 | House | Read first time and referred to Committee on Health, Aging and Long-Term Care |
2023-11-14 | House | Introduced |