WI AB664 | 2023-2024 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 18-11)
Status: Passed on March 21 2024 - 100% progression
Action: 2024-03-21 - Published 3-22-2024
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 18-11)
Status: Passed on March 21 2024 - 100% progression
Action: 2024-03-21 - Published 3-22-2024
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
An Act to amend 11.1303 (title); and to create 11.1303 (2m) of the statutes; Relating to: disclosures regarding content generated by artificial intelligence in political advertisements, granting rule-making authority, and providing a penalty. (FE)
Title
Disclosures regarding content generated by artificial intelligence in political advertisements, granting rule-making authority, and providing a penalty. (FE)
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-03-21 | House | Published 3-22-2024 |
2024-03-21 | House | Report approved by the Governor on 3-21-2024. 2023 Wisconsin Act 123 |
2024-03-18 | House | Presented to the Governor on 3-18-2024 |
2024-03-15 | House | Report correctly enrolled on 3-15-2024 |
2024-03-12 | House | Received from Senate concurred in |
2024-03-12 | Senate | Ordered immediately messaged |
2024-03-12 | Senate | Read a third time and concurred in |
2024-03-12 | Senate | Rules suspended to give bill its third reading |
2024-03-12 | Senate | Ordered to a third reading |
2024-03-12 | Senate | Read a second time |
2024-03-11 | Senate | Placed on calendar 3-12-2024 pursuant to Senate Rule 18(1) |
2024-03-11 | Senate | Public hearing requirement waived by committee on Senate Organization, pursuant to Senate Rule 18 (1m), Ayes 3, Noes 2 |
2024-02-20 | Senate | Representative Shankland added as a coauthor |
2024-02-19 | Senate | Available for scheduling |
2024-02-19 | Senate | Read first time and referred to committee on Senate Organization |
2024-02-15 | Senate | Received from Assembly |
2024-02-15 | House | Ordered immediately messaged |
2024-02-15 | House | Read a third time and passed |
2024-02-15 | House | Rules suspended |
2024-02-15 | House | Ordered to a third reading |
2024-02-15 | House | Assembly Substitute Amendment 1 adopted |
2024-02-15 | House | Read a second time |
2024-02-14 | House | Assembly Substitute Amendment 1 offered by Representative Neylon |
2024-02-13 | House | Placed on calendar 2-15-2024 by Committee on Rules |
2024-02-07 | House | Referred to committee on Rules |
2024-02-07 | House | Report passage as amended recommended by Committee on Campaigns and Elections, Ayes 8, Noes 0 |
2024-02-07 | House | Report Assembly Amendment 2 adoption recommended by Committee on Campaigns and Elections, Ayes 8, Noes 0 |
2024-01-30 | House | Executive action taken |
2024-01-30 | House | Assembly Amendment 2 offered by Committee on Campaigns and Elections |
2024-01-30 | House | Assembly Amendment 1 offered by Representative Rozar |
2024-01-12 | House | Representative Ratcliff added as a coauthor |
2024-01-09 | House | Public hearing held |
2024-01-08 | House | Representative Palmeri added as a coauthor |
2023-11-22 | House | Fiscal estimate received |
2023-11-22 | House | Representative Haywood added as a coauthor |
2023-11-15 | House | Representative Subeck added as a coauthor |
2023-11-09 | House | Read first time and referred to Committee on Campaigns and Elections |
2023-11-09 | House | Introduced |