WI AB664 | 2019-2020 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 12-2)
Status: Failed on April 1 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-04-01 - Failed to pass pursuant to Senate Joint Resolution 1
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 12-2)
Status: Failed on April 1 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-04-01 - Failed to pass pursuant to Senate Joint Resolution 1
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
An Act to repeal 45.82 (3); to amend 20.485 (1) (gk) and 45.82 (2); and to create 45.82 (3m) (a) and 45.82 (3m) (b) 1. to 5. of the statutes; Relating to: grants to counties and tribes for veterans services and making an appropriation. (FE)
Title
Grants to counties and tribes for veterans services and making an appropriation. (FE)
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-04-01 | House | Failed to pass pursuant to Senate Joint Resolution 1 |
2020-03-26 | House | Referred to committee on Rules |
2020-03-26 | House | Report passage as amended recommended by Committee on Veterans and Military Affairs, Ayes 8, Noes 6 |
2020-03-26 | House | Report Assembly Amendment 1 adoption recommended by Committee on Veterans and Military Affairs, Ayes 12, Noes 2 |
2020-02-13 | House | Executive action taken |
2020-01-28 | House | Fiscal estimate received |
2020-01-16 | House | Public hearing held |
2020-01-15 | House | Assembly Amendment 1 offered by Representative Edming |
2019-12-10 | House | Fiscal estimate received |
2019-12-05 | House | Read first time and referred to Committee on Veterans and Military Affairs |
2019-12-05 | House | Introduced |
Wisconsin State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://docs.legis.wisconsin.gov/2019/proposals/reg/asm/bill/ab664 |
Text | https://docs.legis.wisconsin.gov/document/proposaltext/2019/REG/AB664.pdf |