WI AB664 | 2015-2016 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Strong Partisan Bill (Republican 21-2)
Status: Passed on March 31 2016 - 100% progression
Action: 2016-03-31 - Published 3-31-2016
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Strong Partisan Bill (Republican 21-2)
Status: Passed on March 31 2016 - 100% progression
Action: 2016-03-31 - Published 3-31-2016
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
An Act to create 51.03 (6) of the statutes; Relating to: mental health services in schools.
Title
Mental health services in schools.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2016-03-31 | House | Published 3-31-2016 |
2016-03-31 | House | Report approved by the Governor on 3-30-2016. 2015 Wisconsin Act 294 |
2016-03-29 | House | Presented to the Governor on 3-29-2016 |
2016-02-23 | House | Report correctly enrolled on 2-23-2016 |
2016-02-23 | House | LRB correction |
2016-02-17 | House | Received from Senate concurred in |
2016-02-16 | Senate | Ordered immediately messaged |
2016-02-16 | Senate | Read a third time and concurred in |
2016-02-16 | Senate | Rules suspended |
2016-02-16 | Senate | Ordered to a third reading |
2016-02-16 | Senate | Read a second time |
2016-02-16 | Senate | Rules suspended to withdraw from committee on Senate Organization and take up |
2016-02-16 | Senate | Read first time and referred to committee on Senate Organization |
2016-02-16 | Senate | Received from Assembly |
2016-02-16 | House | Ordered immediately messaged |
2016-02-16 | House | Read a third time and passed |
2016-02-16 | House | Rules suspended |
2016-02-16 | House | Ordered to a third reading |
2016-02-16 | House | Assembly Amendment 1 adopted |
2016-02-16 | House | Assembly Amendment 1 offered by Representative Tittl |
2016-02-16 | House | Read a second time |
2016-02-11 | House | Placed on calendar 2-16-2016 by Committee on Rules |
2016-02-02 | House | Referred to committee on Rules |
2016-02-02 | House | Report passage recommended by Committee on Education, Ayes 14, Noes 0 |
2016-01-28 | House | Executive session held |
2016-01-19 | House | Representative Macco added as a coauthor |
2016-01-14 | House | Public hearing held |
2016-01-08 | House | Read first time and referred to Committee on Education |
2016-01-08 | House | Introduced |