WI AB657 | 2015-2016 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 32-16)
Status: Passed on April 26 2016 - 100% progression
Action: 2016-05-17 - Partial veto failed to pass notwithstanding the objections of the Governor pursuant to Joint Rule 82
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 32-16)
Status: Passed on April 26 2016 - 100% progression
Action: 2016-05-17 - Partial veto failed to pass notwithstanding the objections of the Governor pursuant to Joint Rule 82
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
An Act Relating to: treatment and diversion programs and making an appropriation. (FE)
Title
Treatment and diversion programs and making an appropriation. (FE)
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2016-03-15 - Senate - Senate: Read a third time and concurred in (Y: 32 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-02-16 - House - Assembly: Read a third time and passed (Y: 98 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-02-16 - House - Assembly: Read a third time and passed (Y: 98 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2016-05-17 | House | Partial veto failed to pass notwithstanding the objections of the Governor pursuant to Joint Rule 82 |
2016-05-17 | House | Partial veto placed on calendar 5-17-2016 pursuant to Joint Rule 82 (2)(a) |
2016-04-26 | House | Published 4-27-2016 |
2016-04-26 | House | Report approved by the Governor with partial veto on 4-26-2016. 2013 Wisconsin Act 388 |
2016-04-21 | House | Presented to the Governor on 4-21-2016 |
2016-03-24 | House | Report correctly enrolled on 3-24-2016 |
2016-03-16 | House | Received from Senate concurred in |
2016-03-15 | Senate | Ordered immediately messaged |
2016-03-15 | Senate | Read a third time and concurred in, Ayes 32, Noes 0 |
2016-03-15 | Senate | Rules suspended |
2016-03-15 | Senate | Ordered to a third reading |
2016-03-15 | Senate | Read a second time |
2016-03-15 | Senate | Senator Carpenter added as a cosponsor |
2016-03-14 | Senate | Placed on calendar 3-15-2016 pursuant to Senate Rule 18(1) |
2016-03-10 | Senate | Available for scheduling |
2016-03-10 | Senate | Report concurrence recommended by Committee on Judiciary and Public Safety, Ayes 5, Noes 0 |
2016-03-09 | Senate | Executive action taken |
2016-03-02 | Senate | Senator Cowles added as a cosponsor |
2016-03-01 | Senate | Public hearing held |
2016-02-17 | Senate | Read first time and referred to committee on Judiciary and Public Safety |
2016-02-17 | Senate | Received from Assembly |
2016-02-16 | House | Ordered immediately messaged |
2016-02-16 | House | Read a third time and passed, Ayes 98, Noes 0 |
2016-02-16 | House | Rules suspended |
2016-02-16 | House | Ordered to a third reading |
2016-02-16 | House | Assembly Substitute Amendment 2 adopted |
2016-02-16 | House | Read a second time |
2016-02-16 | House | Rules suspended to withdraw from calendar and take up |
2016-02-11 | House | Placed on calendar 2-16-2016 by Committee on Rules |
2016-02-10 | House | Fiscal estimate received |
2016-02-08 | House | Referred to committee on Rules |
2016-02-08 | House | Report passage as amended recommended by Joint Committee on Finance, Ayes 16, Noes 0 |
2016-02-08 | House | Report Assembly Substitute Amendment 2 adoption recommended by Joint Committee on Finance, Ayes 16, Noes 0 |
2016-02-04 | House | Assembly Amendment 2 to Assembly Substitute Amendment 2 offered by Joint Committee on Finance |
2016-02-04 | House | Assembly Amendment 1 to Assembly Substitute Amendment 2 offered by Joint Committee on Finance |
2016-02-04 | House | Executive action taken |
2016-02-04 | House | Public hearing held |
2016-02-03 | House | Assembly Substitute Amendment 2 offered by Representative Nygren |
2016-02-02 | House | Assembly Substitute Amendment 1 offered by Representative Nygren |
2016-02-02 | House | Assembly Amendment 1 offered by Representative Nygren |
2016-01-07 | House | Read first time and referred to Joint Committee on Finance |
2016-01-07 | House | Introduced |