WI AB655 | 2013-2014 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 15-3)
Status: Passed on March 17 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-03-17 - Published 3-18-2014
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 15-3)
Status: Passed on March 17 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-03-17 - Published 3-18-2014
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
An Act to repeal and recreate 30.2038 of the statutes; Relating to: establishing the shoreline of Lake Michigan in the city of Milwaukee.
Title
Establishing the shoreline of Lake Michigan in the city of Milwaukee.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2014-03-11 - Senate - Senate: Read a third time and concurred in (Y: 25 N: 8 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2014-03-17 | House | Published 3-18-2014 |
2014-03-17 | House | Report approved by the Governor on 3-17-2014. 2013 Wisconsin Act 140 |
2014-03-14 | House | Presented to the Governor on 3-14-2014 |
2014-03-14 | House | Report correctly enrolled on 3-14-2014 |
2014-03-12 | House | Received from Senate concurred in |
2014-03-11 | Senate | Ordered immediately messaged |
2014-03-11 | Senate | Read a third time and concurred in, Ayes 25, Noes 8 |
2014-03-11 | Senate | Rules suspended |
2014-03-11 | Senate | Ordered to a third reading |
2014-03-11 | Senate | Read a second time |
2014-03-07 | Senate | Placed on calendar 3-11-2014 pursuant to Senate Rule 18(1) |
2014-03-07 | Senate | Public hearing requirement waived by committee on Senate Organization, pursuant to Senate Rule 18 (1m), Ayes 5, Noes 0 |
2014-02-24 | Senate | Available for scheduling |
2014-02-24 | Senate | Read first time and referred to committee on Senate Organization |
2014-02-21 | Senate | Received from Assembly |
2014-02-20 | House | Ordered immediately messaged |
2014-02-20 | House | Representatives Barca and Zamarripa added as coauthors |
2014-02-20 | House | Read a third time and passed |
2014-02-20 | House | Rules suspended |
2014-02-20 | House | Ordered to a third reading |
2014-02-20 | House | Assembly Amendment 1 adopted |
2014-02-20 | House | Read a second time |
2014-02-18 | House | Placed on calendar 2-20-2014 by Committee on Rules |
2014-02-18 | House | Referred to Committee on Rules |
2014-02-18 | House | Report passage as amended recommended by Committee on Jobs, Economy and Mining, Ayes 16, Noes 0 |
2014-02-18 | House | Report Assembly Amendment 1 adoption recommended by Committee on Jobs, Economy and Mining, Ayes 16, Noes 0 |
2014-02-18 | House | Executive action taken |
2014-02-13 | House | Assembly Amendment 1 offered by Representative Sanfelippo |
2014-02-13 | House | Representative Goyke added as a coauthor |
2014-02-05 | House | Public hearing held |
2014-01-24 | House | Read first time and referred to Committee on Jobs, Economy and Mining |
2014-01-24 | House | Introduced |