WI AB654 | 2023-2024 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 7-0)
Status: Failed on April 15 2024 - 100% progression
Action: 2024-04-15 - Failed to pass pursuant to Senate Joint Resolution 1
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 7-0)
Status: Failed on April 15 2024 - 100% progression
Action: 2024-04-15 - Failed to pass pursuant to Senate Joint Resolution 1
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
An Act to create 49.45 (9o) of the statutes; Relating to: utilization management controls for prescription drugs to treat mental illness under the Medical Assistance program. (FE)
Title
Utilization management controls for prescription drugs to treat mental illness under the Medical Assistance program. (FE)
Sponsors
Rep. Todd Novak [R] | Rep. Barbara Dittrich [R] | Rep. Bob Donovan [R] | Sen. Jesse James [R] |
Sen. Joan Ballweg [R] | Sen. Rachael Cabral-Guevara [R] | Sen. Romaine Quinn [R] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-04-15 | House | Failed to pass pursuant to Senate Joint Resolution 1 |
2024-01-11 | House | Representatives Subeck and Rozar added as coauthors |
2024-01-10 | House | Representative Kitchens added as a coauthor |
2023-12-21 | House | Fiscal estimate received |
2023-11-09 | House | Read first time and referred to Committee on Health, Aging and Long-Term Care |
2023-11-09 | House | Introduced |