WI AB653 | 2023-2024 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Strong Partisan Bill (Republican 13-1)
Status: Failed on April 15 2024 - 100% progression
Action: 2024-04-15 - Failed to pass pursuant to Senate Joint Resolution 1
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Spectrum: Strong Partisan Bill (Republican 13-1)
Status: Failed on April 15 2024 - 100% progression
Action: 2024-04-15 - Failed to pass pursuant to Senate Joint Resolution 1
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
An Act to create chapter 56 of the statutes; Relating to: surrogate decision-making.
Title
Surrogate decision-making.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-04-15 | House | Failed to pass pursuant to Senate Joint Resolution 1 |
2024-02-12 | House | Assembly Amendment 3 offered by Representative Wichgers |
2024-01-23 | House | Assembly Substitute Amendment 1 offered by Representative Snyder |
2024-01-11 | House | Public hearing held |
2024-01-11 | House | Assembly Amendment 2 offered by Representative Wichgers |
2024-01-10 | House | Assembly Amendment 1 offered by Representative Wichgers |
2023-11-09 | House | Read first time and referred to Committee on Family Law |
2023-11-09 | House | Introduced |