WI AB649 | 2013-2014 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 14-4)
Status: Failed on April 8 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-04-08 - Failed to pass pursuant to Senate Joint Resolution 1
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 14-4)
Status: Failed on April 8 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-04-08 - Failed to pass pursuant to Senate Joint Resolution 1
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
An Act to repeal 215.26 (3) and 220.28; to amend 13.92 (4) (c), 13.92 (4) (d), 13.92 (4) (e), 13.92 (4) (f), 35.93 (2) (b) 4., 35.93 (2) (c) 1., 35.93 (3), 35.93 (3) (e) (intro.), 35.93 (3) (e) 1., 186.098 (9m), 186.113 (7), 186.71 (1), 214.75 (4), 214.75 (5) (a), 215.26 (4) (a), 220.285 (1), 227.01 (13) (intro.), 227.11 (2) (intro.) and 227.27 (2); and to create 13.92 (4) (bm), 186.118, 227.01 (13) (yv) and 227.265 of the statutes; Relating to: rule-making procedures and modifying and repealing various rules promulgated by the Department of Financial Institutions. (FE)
Title
Rule-making procedures and modifying and repealing various rules promulgated by the Department of Financial Institutions. (FE)
Sponsors
Sen. David Craig [R] | Rep. Garey Bies [R] | Rep. Ed Brooks [R] | Rep. Robb Kahl [D] |
Sen. Chris Kapenga [R] | Rep. Dean Kaufert [R] | Sen. Dale Kooyenga [R] | Rep. Scott Krug [R] |
Rep. Daniel LeMahieu [R] | Rep. David Murphy [R] | Rep. Joe Sanfelippo [R] | Rep. Gary Tauchen [R] |
Rep. Mandy Wright [D] | Rep. Gordon Hintz [D] | Rep. Josh Zepnick [D] | Sen. Frank Lasee [R] |
Sen. Dale Schultz [R] | Sen. Glenn Grothman [R] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2014-04-08 | House | Failed to pass pursuant to Senate Joint Resolution 1 |
2014-02-11 | House | Laid on the table |
2014-02-11 | House | Representatives Kolste and Barca added as coauthors |
2014-02-06 | House | Placed on calendar 2-11-2014 by Committee on Rules |
2014-02-05 | House | Referred to Committee on Rules |
2014-02-05 | House | Report passage as amended recommended by Committee on Financial Institutions, Ayes 15, Noes 0 |
2014-02-05 | House | Report Assembly Amendment 1 adoption recommended by Committee on Financial Institutions, Ayes 13, Noes 0 |
2014-02-04 | House | Executive action taken |
2014-02-04 | House | Representative Sargent added as a coauthor |
2014-01-30 | House | Assembly Amendment 1 offered by Representative Craig |
2014-01-29 | House | Public hearing held |
2014-01-23 | House | Fiscal estimate received |
2014-01-22 | House | Read first time and referred to Committee on Financial Institutions |
2014-01-22 | House | Introduced |
Wisconsin State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://docs.legis.wisconsin.gov/2013/proposals/reg/asm/bill/ab649 |
Text | https://docs.legis.wisconsin.gov/document/proposaltext/2013/REG/AB649.pdf |