WI AB645 | 2015-2016 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 11-0)
Status: Failed on April 13 2016 - 100% progression
Action: 2016-04-13 - Failed to pass pursuant to Senate Joint Resolution 1
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 11-0)
Status: Failed on April 13 2016 - 100% progression
Action: 2016-04-13 - Failed to pass pursuant to Senate Joint Resolution 1
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
An Act to repeal 97.20 (1) (g), 97.20 (2) (e) 5. b., 97.21 (1) (d), 97.22 (1) (e), 97.23 (1) (b), 97.24 (1) (cm), 97.29 (1) (g) 1. and 2., 97.29 (1) (g) 3. and 97.29 (1) (g) 4. to 8.; to renumber and amend 97.20 (1) (b), 97.29 (1) (g) (intro.), 97.29 (1) (h) and 97.29 (1) (h); to consolidate, renumber and amend 97.20 (2) (e) 5. (intro.) and a.; to amend 97.01 (1), 97.01 (10) (a), 97.01 (11), 97.09 (1), 97.18 (1) (a), 97.20 (1) (a), 97.20 (1) (h), 97.24 (1) (ar), 97.25 (1) (b), 97.27 (1) (b) 5., 97.29 (1) (h) 2., 126.01 (17) and 234.90 (1) (cp); to create 97.01 (10) (b), 97.01 (10) (c), 97.20 (1) (b) 1. to 5., 97.20 (1) (fg), 97.20 (1) (fm) and 97.29 (1) (h) 1. to 13. of the statutes; and to affect 1983 Wisconsin Act 536; Relating to: dairy plant and food processing plant licensing requirements and granting rule-making authority.
Title
Dairy plant and food processing plant licensing requirements and granting rule-making authority.
Sponsors
Rep. Lee Nerison [R] | Rep. Ed Brooks [R] | Sen. Joan Ballweg [R] | Sen. Rob Hutton [R] |
Rep. Tom Larson [R] | Rep. David Murphy [R] | Rep. John Murtha [R] | Rep. Alvin Ott [R] |
Rep. Gary Tauchen [R] | Sen. Terry Moulton [R] | Sen. Howard Marklein [R] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2016-04-13 | House | Failed to pass pursuant to Senate Joint Resolution 1 |
2016-02-02 | House | Referred to committee on Rules |
2016-02-02 | House | Report passage recommended by Committee on Agriculture, Ayes 13, Noes 0 |
2016-01-26 | House | Executive action taken |
2016-01-13 | House | Public hearing held |
2016-01-07 | House | Read first time and referred to Committee on Agriculture |
2016-01-07 | House | Introduced |
Wisconsin State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://docs.legis.wisconsin.gov/2015/proposals/reg/asm/bill/ab645 |
Text | https://docs.legis.wisconsin.gov/document/proposaltext/2015/REG/AB645.pdf |