WI AB639 | 2021-2022 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 48-27)
Status: Failed on March 15 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-03-15 - Failed to pass pursuant to Senate Joint Resolution 1
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 48-27)
Status: Failed on March 15 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-03-15 - Failed to pass pursuant to Senate Joint Resolution 1
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
An Act to create 20.855 (4) (bg) of the statutes; Relating to: the University of Wisconsin Missing-in-Action Recovery and Identification Project and making an appropriation. (FE)
Title
The University of Wisconsin Missing-in-Action Recovery and Identification Project and making an appropriation. (FE)
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-03-15 | House | Failed to pass pursuant to Senate Joint Resolution 1 |
2022-03-09 | House | Referred to committee on Rules |
2022-03-09 | House | Report passage recommended by Committee on Colleges and Universities, Ayes 13, Noes 0 |
2022-03-08 | House | Executive action taken |
2022-01-28 | House | Representative Moses added as a coauthor |
2022-01-26 | House | Public hearing held |
2022-01-26 | House | Representative Krug added as a coauthor |
2021-11-03 | House | Representative Knodl added as a coauthor |
2021-11-02 | House | Fiscal estimate received |
2021-10-21 | House | Read first time and referred to Committee on Colleges and Universities |
2021-10-21 | House | Introduced |