WI AB62 | 2021-2022 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 12-0)
Status: Failed on March 15 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-03-15 - Failed to pass pursuant to Senate Joint Resolution 1
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 12-0)
Status: Failed on March 15 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-03-15 - Failed to pass pursuant to Senate Joint Resolution 1
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
An Act to amend 118.133 (1) (a), 118.133 (1) (b) and 118.133 (2) of the statutes; Relating to: participation in interscholastic athletics and extracurricular activities and school district membership in an interscholastic athletic association in the 2021-22 school year. (FE)
Title
Participation in interscholastic athletics and extracurricular activities and school district membership in an interscholastic athletic association in the 2021-22 school year. (FE)
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-03-15 | House | Failed to pass pursuant to Senate Joint Resolution 1 |
2021-03-18 | House | Representative Allen added as a coauthor |
2021-03-16 | House | Assembly Amendment 1 offered by Representative Dittrich |
2021-03-04 | House | Representative Ramthun added as a coauthor |
2021-03-04 | House | Public hearing held |
2021-02-17 | House | Fiscal estimate received |
2021-02-12 | House | Read first time and referred to Committee on Education |
2021-02-12 | House | Introduced |