WI AB603 | 2011-2012 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 4-1-1)
Status: Failed on March 23 2012 - 100% progression
Action: 2012-03-23 - Failed to pass pursuant to Senate Joint Resolution 1
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 4-1-1)
Status: Failed on March 23 2012 - 100% progression
Action: 2012-03-23 - Failed to pass pursuant to Senate Joint Resolution 1
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
An Act to renumber 769.601; to amend 49.854 (5) (c) and 71.93 (3) (a); and to create 49.895 and 769.601 (2) of the statutes; relating to: the collection of delinquent child support and granting rule-making authority. (FE)
Title
The collection of delinquent child support and granting rule-making authority. (FE)
Sponsors
Rep. Scott Krug [R] | Rep. Bob Ziegelbauer [I] | Rep. Richard Spanbauer [R] | Rep. Kevin Petersen [R] |
Rep. Steve Doyle [D] | Rep. Michael Endsley [R] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2012-03-23 | House | Failed to pass pursuant to Senate Joint Resolution 1 |
2012-03-09 | House | Referred to committee on Rules |
2012-03-09 | House | Report passage recommended by committee on Children and Families, Ayes 7, Noes 0 |
2012-03-06 | House | Executive action taken |
2012-03-01 | House | Fiscal estimate received |
2012-02-29 | House | Fiscal estimate received |
2012-02-22 | House | Public hearing held |
2012-02-21 | House | Read first time and referred to committee on Children and Families |
2012-02-21 | House | Introduced |
Wisconsin State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://docs.legis.wisconsin.gov/2011/proposals/reg/asm/bill/ab603 |
Text | https://docs.legis.wisconsin.gov/document/proposaltext/2011/REG/AB603.pdf |