WI AB603 | 2009-2010 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Failed on April 28 2010 - 100% progression
Action: 2010-04-28 - Failed to pass pursuant to Senate Joint Resolution 1
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Failed on April 28 2010 - 100% progression
Action: 2010-04-28 - Failed to pass pursuant to Senate Joint Resolution 1
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
An Act to amend 23.33 (4) (b), 23.33 (5) (a), 23.33 (8) (e) and 346.94 (1); and to create 23.33 (1) (jq), 23.33 (3) (hg), 23.33 (3) (hr) and 23.33 (4) (f) of the statutes; relating to: operation of all-terrain vehicles to remove snow.
Title
Operation of all-terrain vehicles to remove snow.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2010-04-28 | Failed to pass pursuant to Senate Joint Resolution 1 | |
2010-02-15 | Fiscal estimate received | |
2010-02-10 | Public hearing held | |
2010-01-21 | Fiscal estimate received | |
2009-11-24 | Read first time and referred to committee on Renewable Energy and Rural Affairs | |
2009-11-24 | Introduced |
Wisconsin State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://docs.legis.wisconsin.gov/2009/proposals/reg/asm/bill/ab603 |
Text | https://docs.legis.wisconsin.gov/document/proposaltext/2009/REG/AB603.pdf |