WI AB599 | 2021-2022 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 4-2)
Status: Failed on March 15 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-03-15 - Failed to pass pursuant to Senate Joint Resolution 1
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 4-2)
Status: Failed on March 15 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-03-15 - Failed to pass pursuant to Senate Joint Resolution 1
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
An Act to repeal 961.14 (7) (mk) and 961.14 (7) (mL); and to create 100.365 and 941.41 of the statutes; Relating to: regulating kratom products, granting rule-making authority, and providing a penalty. (FE)
Title
Regulating kratom products, granting rule-making authority, and providing a penalty. (FE)
Sponsors
Rep. David Murphy [R] | Sen. Rachael Cabral-Guevara [R] | Rep. Christine Sinicki [D] | Rep. Chuck Wichgers [R] |
Sen. Mary Felzkowski [R] | Sen. Lena Taylor [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-03-15 | House | Failed to pass pursuant to Senate Joint Resolution 1 |
2022-02-23 | House | Assembly Amendment 2 offered by Representative Neubauer |
2022-02-23 | House | Assembly Amendment 1 offered by Representatives Hesselbein, Anderson, Brostoff, Considine, Doyle, Goyke, Hebl, Hong, B. Meyers, McGuire, Moore Omokunde, Neubauer, Ohnstad, Pope, Shankland, Shelton, Snodgrass, Sinicki, Spreitzer, Stubbs, Subeck, Vining and Vruwink |
2022-02-22 | House | Made a special order of business at 8:31 AM on 2-23-2022 pursuant to Assembly Resolution 29 |
2022-02-22 | House | Representative Macco added as a coauthor |
2022-02-22 | House | Representative Wichgers withdrawn as a coauthor |
2022-02-17 | House | Representative James withdrawn as a coauthor |
2022-02-01 | House | Referred to committee on Rules |
2022-02-01 | House | Report passage recommended by Committee on State Affairs, Ayes 9, Noes 2 |
2022-01-18 | House | Representative Brostoff added as a coauthor |
2022-01-05 | House | Executive action taken |
2021-12-15 | House | Fiscal estimate received |
2021-12-08 | House | Public hearing held |
2021-12-01 | House | Representative Drake added as a coauthor |
2021-11-10 | House | Fiscal estimate received |
2021-11-05 | House | Fiscal estimate received |
2021-11-04 | House | Representative James added as a coauthor |
2021-10-07 | House | Read first time and referred to Committee on State Affairs |
2021-10-07 | House | Introduced |