WI AB575 | 2023-2024 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 8-0)
Status: Failed on April 15 2024 - 100% progression
Action: 2024-04-15 - Failed to concur in pursuant to Senate Joint Resolution 1
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 8-0)
Status: Failed on April 15 2024 - 100% progression
Action: 2024-04-15 - Failed to concur in pursuant to Senate Joint Resolution 1
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
An Act to renumber 115.28 (63); and to create 115.28 (63) (bm), 118.40 (4) (ar) 3. and 4. and 120.12 (24m) of the statutes; Relating to: the mental health training program provided by the Department of Public Instruction. (FE)
Title
The mental health training program provided by the Department of Public Instruction. (FE)
Sponsors
Rep. Chanz Green [R] | Rep. David Armstrong [R] | Rep. Gae Magnafici [R] | Rep. Jeffrey Mursau [R] |
Rep. Nik Rettinger [R] | Rep. David Steffen [R] | Rep. Rob Summerfield [R] | Sen. Jesse James [R] |
Roll Calls
2023-11-14 - House - Assembly: Assembly Amendment 1 laid on table (Y: 63 N: 35 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-04-15 | Senate | Failed to concur in pursuant to Senate Joint Resolution 1 |
2023-11-21 | Senate | Read first time and referred to committee on Education |
2023-11-15 | Senate | Received from Assembly |
2023-11-14 | House | Ordered immediately messaged |
2023-11-14 | House | Representative Krug added as a coauthor |
2023-11-14 | House | Read a third time and passed |
2023-11-14 | House | Rules suspended |
2023-11-14 | House | Ordered to a third reading |
2023-11-14 | House | Assembly Amendment 1 laid on table, Ayes 63, Noes 35 |
2023-11-14 | House | Assembly Amendment 1 offered by Representatives Vining, Billings, Conley, Neubauer, Haywood, Madison, Jacobson, Drake, Clancy, Hong, Moore Omokunde, Ratcliff, Palmeri, Emerson, Snodgrass, Sinicki, Ohnstad, Joers, Andraca, Bare, Shelton, Considine, Goyke, Shankland, Cabrera, Ortiz-Velez, Baldeh and Stubbs |
2023-11-14 | House | Read a second time |
2023-11-14 | House | Fiscal estimate received |
2023-11-08 | House | Placed on calendar 11-14-2023 by Committee on Rules |
2023-11-08 | House | Referred to committee on Rules |
2023-11-08 | House | Report passage recommended by Committee on Education, Ayes 11, Noes 3 |
2023-11-08 | House | Executive action taken |
2023-11-01 | House | Public hearing held |
2023-10-30 | House | Read first time and referred to Committee on Education |
2023-10-30 | House | Introduced |