WI AB544 | 2019-2020 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 21-0)
Status: Failed on April 1 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-04-01 - Failed to concur in pursuant to Senate Joint Resolution 1
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 21-0)
Status: Failed on April 1 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-04-01 - Failed to concur in pursuant to Senate Joint Resolution 1
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
An Act to amend 76.67 (2); and to create 16.309 (4), 71.07 (8f), 71.10 (4) (fd), 71.28 (8f), 71.30 (3) (cu), 71.47 (8f), 71.49 (1) (cu), 76.6395 and 234.045 of the statutes; Relating to: workforce housing tax credits and economic development revolving loan funds. (FE)
Title
Workforce housing tax credits and economic development revolving loan funds. (FE)
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2020-01-21 - House - Assembly: Read a third time and passed (Y: 97 N: 1 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-04-01 | Senate | Failed to concur in pursuant to Senate Joint Resolution 1 |
2020-03-11 | Senate | Available for scheduling |
2020-03-11 | Senate | Report concurrence recommended by Committee on Utilities and Housing, Ayes 5, Noes 0 |
2020-03-10 | Senate | Executive action taken |
2020-02-28 | Senate | Read first time and referred to committee on Utilities and Housing |
2020-01-22 | Senate | Received from Assembly |
2020-01-21 | House | Ordered immediately messaged |
2020-01-21 | House | Read a third time and passed, Ayes 97, Noes 1 |
2020-01-21 | House | Rules suspended |
2020-01-21 | House | Ordered to a third reading |
2020-01-21 | House | Assembly Substitute Amendment 1 adopted |
2020-01-21 | House | Withdrawn from joint committee on Finance and taken up |
2020-01-21 | House | Referred to joint committee on Finance |
2020-01-21 | House | Read a second time |
2020-01-16 | House | Placed on calendar 1-21-2020 by Committee on Rules |
2020-01-16 | House | Referred to committee on Rules |
2020-01-16 | House | Report passage as amended recommended by Committee on Housing and Real Estate, Ayes 9, Noes 0 |
2020-01-16 | House | Report Assembly Substitute Amendment 1 adoption recommended by Committee on Housing and Real Estate, Ayes 9, Noes 0 |
2020-01-07 | House | Executive action taken |
2019-12-19 | House | Assembly Substitute Amendment 1 offered by Representatives Nygren, Tranel and Summerfield |
2019-11-05 | House | Fiscal estimate received |
2019-11-01 | House | Fiscal estimate received |
2019-10-28 | House | Fiscal estimate received |
2019-10-24 | House | Public hearing held |
2019-10-14 | House | Read first time and referred to Committee on Housing and Real Estate |
2019-10-14 | House | Introduced |