WI AB544 | 2009-2010 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 12-0)
Status: Engrossed on March 4 2010 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2010-04-28 - Failed to concur in pursuant to Senate Joint Resolution 1
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on March 4 2010 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2010-04-28 - Failed to concur in pursuant to Senate Joint Resolution 1
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
An Act to create 100.277 of the statutes; relating to: prohibiting the installation, sale, and distribution of wheel weights and other wheel balancing products that contain lead.
Title
Prohibiting the installation, sale, and distribution of wheel weights and other wheel balancing products that contain lead.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2010-04-28 | Failed to concur in pursuant to Senate Joint Resolution 1 | |
2010-04-22 | Ordered to a third reading | |
2010-04-22 | Read a second time | |
2010-04-21 | Placed on calendar 4-22-2010 pursuant to Senate Rule 18(1) | |
2010-04-14 | Available for scheduling | |
2010-04-14 | Report concurrence recommended by committee on Environment, Ayes 3, Noes 2 | |
2010-04-14 | Executive action taken | |
2010-03-23 | Public hearing held | |
2010-03-08 | Read first time and referred to committee on Environment | |
2010-03-05 | Received from Assembly | |
2010-03-04 | Ordered immediately messaged | |
2010-03-04 | Read a third time and passed, Ayes 52, Noes 42 | |
2010-03-04 | Rules suspended | |
2010-03-04 | Ordered to a third reading | |
2010-03-04 | Assembly amendment 1 adopted | |
2010-03-04 | Assembly amendment 1 offered by Representatives Danou and Black | |
2010-03-04 | Read a second time | |
2010-03-02 | Placed on calendar 3-4-2010 by committee on Rules | |
2010-01-14 | Referred to committee on Rules | |
2010-01-14 | Report passage recommended by committee on Natural Resources, Ayes 8, Noes 5 | |
2010-01-13 | Executive action taken | |
2009-11-18 | Public hearing held | |
2009-11-16 | Fiscal estimate received | |
2009-11-03 | Read first time and referred to committee on Natural Resources | |
2009-11-03 | Introduced |
Wisconsin State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://docs.legis.wisconsin.gov/2009/proposals/reg/asm/bill/ab544 |
Text | https://docs.legis.wisconsin.gov/document/proposaltext/2009/REG/AB544.pdf |