WI AB537 | 2021-2022 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 15-2)
Status: Passed on February 4 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-02-04 - Published 2-5-2022
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 15-2)
Status: Passed on February 4 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-02-04 - Published 2-5-2022
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
An Act to repeal 971.16 (1); to renumber and amend 455.03; to amend 16.417 (1) (e) 4., 48.375 (2) (c), 48.375 (4) (b) 1m., 49.45 (30f), 49.45 (30j) (a) 1., 50.06 (4), 51.03 (6) (a), 51.15 (2) (c), 146.34 (1) (i), 146.81 (1) (h), 146.997 (1) (d) 10., 155.01 (1g) (a), 155.01 (7), 165.77 (1) (a), 244.09 (3) (a), 252.14 (1) (ar) 6., 440.03 (13) (b) (intro.), 440.03 (13) (c), 440.15, 446.01 (1v) (L), 450.10 (3) (a) 9., chapter 455 (title), 455.01 (intro.), 455.02 (2m) (intro.), 455.02 (2m) (f), 455.02 (2m) (p), 455.03 (title), 455.06 (1) (a) and (2), 455.09 (1) (intro.), 455.09 (1) (c), 455.09 (1) (d), 455.09 (1) (g), 455.09 (3), 455.11, 457.02 (3), 632.89 (1) (e) 3., 905.04 (1) (e), 939.615 (6) (e) and 971.17 (7) (c); to repeal and recreate 302.384 (1m); and to create 14.89, 440.03 (11m) (c) 2s., subchapter I (title) of chapter 455 [precedes 455.01], 455.01 (1), 455.01 (2m), 455.01 (3r), 455.01 (9), 455.03 (2), 455.03 (3), subchapter II of chapter 455 [precedes 455.50], 455.51 and 990.01 (31m) of the statutes; Relating to: ratification of the Psychology Interjurisdictional Compact. (FE)
Title
Ratification of the Psychology Interjurisdictional Compact. (FE)
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-02-04 | House | Published 2-5-2022 |
2022-02-04 | House | Report approved by the Governor on 2-4-2022. 2021 Wisconsin Act 131 |
2022-02-01 | House | Presented to the Governor on 2-1-2022 |
2022-01-31 | House | Report correctly enrolled on 1-31-2022 |
2022-01-25 | House | Received from Senate concurred in |
2022-01-25 | Senate | Ordered immediately messaged |
2022-01-25 | Senate | Read a third time and concurred in |
2022-01-25 | Senate | Rules suspended |
2022-01-25 | Senate | Ordered to a third reading |
2022-01-25 | Senate | Read a second time |
2022-01-21 | Senate | Placed on calendar 1-25-2022 pursuant to Senate Rule 18(1) |
2022-01-21 | Senate | Public hearing requirement waived by committee on Senate Organization, pursuant to Senate Rule 18 (1m), Ayes 5, Noes 0 |
2022-01-21 | Senate | Available for scheduling |
2022-01-21 | Senate | Read first time and referred to committee on Senate Organization |
2022-01-20 | Senate | Received from Assembly |
2022-01-20 | House | Ordered immediately messaged |
2022-01-20 | House | Read a third time and passed |
2022-01-20 | House | Rules suspended |
2022-01-20 | House | Ordered to a third reading |
2022-01-20 | House | Assembly Amendment 1 adopted |
2022-01-20 | House | Read a second time |
2022-01-18 | House | Placed on calendar 1-20-2022 by Committee on Rules |
2022-01-18 | House | Referred to committee on Rules |
2022-01-18 | House | Report passage as amended recommended by Committee on Health, Ayes 15, Noes 0 |
2022-01-18 | House | Report Assembly Amendment 1 adoption recommended by Committee on Health, Ayes 15, Noes 0 |
2022-01-12 | House | Executive action taken |
2022-01-12 | House | Representative Subeck added as a coauthor |
2022-01-11 | House | Assembly Amendment 1 offered by Representative Tittl |
2022-01-06 | House | Representatives Dittrich and Moses added as coauthors |
2022-01-06 | House | Public hearing held |
2021-09-23 | House | Fiscal estimate received |
2021-09-16 | House | Senator Larson added as a cosponsor |
2021-09-13 | House | Representative Wichgers added as a coauthor |
2021-09-10 | House | Read first time and referred to Committee on Health |
2021-09-10 | House | Introduced |