WI AB505 | 2021-2022 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 20-0)
Status: Failed on March 15 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-03-15 - Failed to pass pursuant to Senate Joint Resolution 1
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 20-0)
Status: Failed on March 15 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-03-15 - Failed to pass pursuant to Senate Joint Resolution 1
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
An Act to amend 23.24 (2) (a) 1., 23.24 (2) (a) 2., 23.24 (2) (c) 7., 23.24 (3) (b) and 23.24 (3) (c); and to create 23.24 (1) (je), 23.24 (4) (b) 5. and 23.24 (4) (b) 6. of the statutes; Relating to: aquatic plant management plans and permit exemptions.
Title
Aquatic plant management plans and permit exemptions.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-03-15 | House | Failed to pass pursuant to Senate Joint Resolution 1 |
2022-02-23 | House | Laid on the table |
2022-02-22 | House | Made a special order of business at 8:15 AM on 2-23-2022 pursuant to Assembly Resolution 29 |
2022-02-01 | House | Referred to committee on Rules |
2022-02-01 | House | Report passage as amended recommended by Committee on Environment, Ayes 7, Noes 2 |
2022-02-01 | House | Report Assembly Amendment 2 adoption recommended by Committee on Environment, Ayes 7, Noes 2 |
2022-01-18 | House | Executive action taken |
2022-01-14 | House | Assembly Amendment 2 offered by Representative Steineke |
2022-01-03 | House | Assembly Amendment 1 offered by Representative Steineke |
2021-10-06 | House | Public hearing held |
2021-08-24 | House | Read first time and referred to Committee on Environment |
2021-08-24 | House | Introduced |