WI AB49 | 2017-2018 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Failed on March 28 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-03-28 - Failed to pass pursuant to Senate Joint Resolution 1
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Failed on March 28 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-03-28 - Failed to pass pursuant to Senate Joint Resolution 1
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
An Act to renumber 961.32; to renumber and amend 961.38 (1n); to amend 961.14 (4) (t) and 961.52 (2) (a) 1. and 2.; and to create 961.11 (4g) and 961.32 (2m) of the statutes; Relating to: definition of tetrahydrocannabinols and the use of cannabidiol.
Title
Definition of tetrahydrocannabinols and the use of cannabidiol.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-03-28 | House | Failed to pass pursuant to Senate Joint Resolution 1 |
2017-03-07 | House | Laid on the table |
2017-03-07 | House | Representative Macco added as a coauthor |
2017-03-01 | House | Placed on calendar 3-7-2017 by Committee on Rules |
2017-02-27 | House | Referred to committee on Rules |
2017-02-27 | House | Report passage recommended by Committee on Children and Families, Ayes 12, Noes 0 |
2017-02-23 | House | Representative Allen added as a coauthor |
2017-02-22 | House | Executive action taken |
2017-02-22 | House | Assembly Substitute Amendment 1 offered by Representative C. Taylor |
2017-02-15 | House | Representative Snyder added as a coauthor |
2017-02-15 | House | Public hearing held |
2017-02-02 | House | Read first time and referred to Committee on Children and Families |
2017-02-02 | House | Introduced |
Wisconsin State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://docs.legis.wisconsin.gov/2017/proposals/reg/asm/bill/ab49 |
Text | https://docs.legis.wisconsin.gov/document/proposaltext/2017/REG/AB49.pdf |