WI AB480 | 2009-2010 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 12-0)
Status: Engrossed on March 4 2010 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2010-04-28 - Failed to concur in pursuant to Senate Joint Resolution 1
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on March 4 2010 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2010-04-28 - Failed to concur in pursuant to Senate Joint Resolution 1
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
An Act to amend 814.04 (intro.); and to create 893.583 and 895.437 of the statutes; relating to: creating a civil cause of action for acts of violence motivated by gender.
Title
Creating a civil cause of action for acts of violence motivated by gender.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2010-04-28 | Failed to concur in pursuant to Senate Joint Resolution 1 | |
2010-03-19 | Available for scheduling | |
2010-03-19 | Report concurrence recommended by committee on Judiciary, Corrections, Insurance, Campaign Finance Reform, and Housing, Ayes 4, Noes 1 | |
2010-03-17 | Executive action taken | |
2010-03-08 | Read first time and referred to committee on Judiciary, Corrections, Insurance, Campaign Finance Reform, and Housing | |
2010-03-05 | Received from Assembly | |
2010-03-04 | Ordered immediately messaged | |
2010-03-04 | Read a third time and passed | |
2010-03-04 | Rules suspended | |
2010-03-04 | Refused to indefinitely postpone | |
2010-03-04 | Ordered to a third reading | |
2010-03-04 | Assembly amendment 6 adopted | |
2010-03-04 | Assembly amendment 5 adopted | |
2010-03-04 | Read a second time | |
2010-03-03 | Assembly amendment 6 offered by Representative Berceau | |
2010-03-02 | Placed on calendar 3-4-2010 by committee on Rules | |
2010-02-16 | Referred to committee on Rules | |
2010-02-16 | Report passage as amended recommended by committee on Corrections and the Courts, Ayes 8, Noes 2 | |
2010-02-16 | Report Assembly Amendment 5 adoption recommended by committee on Corrections and the Courts, Ayes 10, Noes 0 | |
2010-02-10 | Executive action taken | |
2010-02-09 | Assembly amendment 5 offered by Representative Berceau | |
2010-02-08 | Assembly amendment 4 offered by Representatives Van Roy and Berceau | |
2010-02-08 | Assembly amendment 3 offered by Representative Berceau | |
2010-02-05 | Assembly substitute amendment 1 offered by Representative Gundrum | |
2010-02-03 | Assembly amendment 2 offered by Representative Kessler | |
2010-01-21 | Public hearing held | |
2010-01-20 | Assembly amendment 1 offered by Representative Berceau | |
2009-10-06 | Read first time and referred to committee on Corrections and the Courts | |
2009-10-06 | Introduced |
Wisconsin State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://docs.legis.wisconsin.gov/2009/proposals/reg/asm/bill/ab480 |
Text | https://docs.legis.wisconsin.gov/document/proposaltext/2009/REG/AB480.pdf |