WI AB475 | 2011-2012 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 15-0)
Status: Failed on March 23 2012 - 100% progression
Action: 2012-03-23 - Failed to pass pursuant to Senate Joint Resolution 1
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 15-0)
Status: Failed on March 23 2012 - 100% progression
Action: 2012-03-23 - Failed to pass pursuant to Senate Joint Resolution 1
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
An Act to renumber subchapter IV of chapter 50 [precedes 50.90]; to renumber and amend 59.54 (25), 961.55 (8), 968.19 and 968.20 (1); to amend 20.435 (6) (jm), 50.56 (3), 59.54 (25m), 66.0107 (1) (bm), 66.0107 (1) (bp), 146.40 (1) (bo), 146.81 (1) (L), 146.997 (1) (d) 18., 149.14 (3) (nm), 173.12 (1m), 289.33 (3) (d), 349.02 (2) (b) 4., 767.41 (5) (am) (intro.), 767.451 (5m) (a) (intro.), 961.555 (2) (a), 961.56 (1) and 968.20 (3) (a) and (b); and to create 20.435 (1) (gq), 20.435 (1) (jm), subchapter IV of chapter 50 [precedes 50.60], 59.54 (25) (b) 2., 59.54 (25) (b) 3., 146.44, 767.41 (5) (d), 767.451 (5m) (d), 961.01 (5m), 961.01 (11v), 961.01 (12v), 961.01 (14c), 961.01 (14g), 961.01 (17k), 961.01 (19m), 961.01 (20hm), 961.01 (20ht), 961.01 (20t), 961.01 (21f), 961.01 (21t), 961.436, 961.55 (8) (b), 961.55 (8) (c), 961.55 (8) (d), 961.555 (2) (e), 961.555 (2m), 961.5755, 968.072, 968.12 (5), 968.19 (2), 968.20 (1d) and 968.20 (1j) of the statutes; relating to: medical use of marijuana, the regulation of marijuana distribution organizations, requiring the exercise of rule-making authority, making appropriations, and providing a penalty. (FE)
Title
Medical use of marijuana, the regulation of marijuana distribution organizations, requiring the exercise of rule-making authority, making appropriations, and providing a penalty. (FE)
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2012-03-23 | House | Failed to pass pursuant to Senate Joint Resolution 1 |
2012-02-06 | House | Fiscal estimate received |
2012-01-27 | House | Fiscal estimate received |
2012-01-24 | House | Fiscal estimate received |
2012-01-18 | House | Read first time and referred to committee on Health |
2012-01-18 | House | Introduced |
Wisconsin State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://docs.legis.wisconsin.gov/2011/proposals/reg/asm/bill/ab475 |
Text | https://docs.legis.wisconsin.gov/document/proposaltext/2011/REG/AB475.pdf |