WI AB47 | 2019-2020 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (? 1-0)
Status: Passed on February 28 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-02-28 - Published 2-29-2020
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]

Summary

An Act to renumber subchapter XX of chapter 48 [precedes 48.98]; to renumber and amend 54.56, 54.57, 808.075 (4) (f) 3. and 814.66 (1) (m); to amend 48.09 (5), 48.14 (2) (b), 48.14 (11), 48.15, 48.235 (1) (c), 48.255 (1) (intro.), 48.293 (2), 48.299 (4) (a), 48.299 (4) (b), 48.299 (6) (intro.), 48.299 (6) (d), 48.299 (7), 48.368 (1), 48.465 (3), 48.62 (2), 48.831 (1), 48.831 (1m) (e), 48.977 (8), 48.978 (7), 51.30 (4) (b) 18. a., 51.30 (4) (b) 18. c., 54.01 (10), 54.10 (1), 54.15 (6), 54.25 (2) (d) 1., 54.25 (2) (d) 2. o., 54.52 (1), 55.03 (1), 115.76 (12) (b) 2., 118.125 (2) (L), 146.82 (2) (a) 9. a., 146.82 (2) (a) 9. c., 757.69 (1) (g) 5., 808.075 (4) (a) 11., 809.30 (1) (a), 809.30 (1) (b) 2., 809.30 (2) (a) and 938.345 (1) (e); and to create subchapter XX (title) of chapter 48 [precedes 48.978], 48.9795, 48.981 (7) (a) 11v., 808.075 (4) (a) 9m. and 808.075 (4) (a) 13. of the statutes; Relating to: guardianships of children. (FE)

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Guardianships of children. (FE)

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2020-02-28HousePublished 2-29-2020
2020-02-28HouseReport approved by the Governor on 2-28-2020. 2019 Wisconsin Act 109
2020-02-26HousePresented to the Governor on 2-26-2020
2020-02-25HouseReport correctly enrolled on 2-25-2020
2020-02-25HouseLRB correction
2020-02-20HouseReceived from Senate concurred in
2020-02-19SenateOrdered immediately messaged
2020-02-19SenateRead a third time and concurred in
2020-02-19SenateRules suspended
2020-02-19SenateOrdered to a third reading
2020-02-19SenateRead a second time
2020-02-14SenatePlaced on calendar 2-19-2020 pursuant to Senate Rule 18(1)
2020-01-31SenateAvailable for scheduling
2020-01-31SenateReport concurrence recommended by Committee on Universities, Technical Colleges, Children and Families, Ayes 6, Noes 1
2020-01-31SenateExecutive action taken
2020-01-22SenatePublic hearing held
2019-11-22SenateRead first time and referred to committee on Universities, Technical Colleges, Children and Families
2019-11-12SenateReceived from Assembly
2019-11-12HouseOrdered immediately messaged
2019-11-12HouseRead a third time and passed
2019-11-12HouseRules suspended
2019-11-12HouseOrdered to a third reading
2019-11-12HouseAssembly Amendment 1 adopted
2019-11-12HouseRead a second time
2019-11-07HousePlaced on calendar 11-12-2019 by Committee on Rules
2019-11-06HouseReferred to committee on Rules
2019-11-06HouseReport passage as amended recommended by Committee on Family Law, Ayes 9, Noes 0
2019-11-06HouseReport Assembly Amendment 1 adoption recommended by Committee on Family Law, Ayes 9, Noes 0
2019-09-10HouseExecutive action taken
2019-09-04HouseAssembly Amendment 1 offered by Representative Steineke
2019-05-21HousePublic hearing held
2019-03-20HouseFiscal estimate received
2019-03-18HouseFiscal estimate received
2019-03-14HouseFiscal estimate received
2019-03-13HouseFiscal estimate received
2019-02-28HouseRead first time and referred to Committee on Family Law
2019-02-28HouseIntroduced

Wisconsin State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback