WI AB465 | 2017-2018 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 18-0)
Status: Failed on March 28 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-03-28 - Failed to pass pursuant to Senate Joint Resolution 1
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 18-0)
Status: Failed on March 28 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-03-28 - Failed to pass pursuant to Senate Joint Resolution 1
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
An Act to repeal 20.410 (3) (gg), 46.011 (1c), 46.011 (1p), 46.215 (2) (a) 3., 46.215 (2) (c) 3., 46.22 (1) (b) 5m. d., 46.22 (1) (e) 3. c., 46.22 (2g) (d) 4., 46.23 (5) (a) 3., 46.23 (5) (c) 3., 46.23 (5) (n) 3., 49.11 (1c), 49.855 (2p), 301.01 (1n), 301.03 (18), 301.031, 301.032, 301.06, 301.08 (2) (d) 5., 301.085 (2), 301.085 (4), 301.12, 301.26 (title), 301.26 (1), 301.35 (2) (e), 302.386 (5) (c), 302.386 (5) (d), 938.48 (intro.), 938.48 (1) and 938.48 (16); to renumber 20.410 (3) (title), 20.410 (3) (a), 20.410 (3) (ba), 20.410 (3) (c), 20.410 (3) (dm), 20.410 (3) (e), 20.410 (3) (i), 20.410 (3) (jr), 20.410 (3) (jv), 20.410 (3) (kx), 20.410 (3) (ky), 20.410 (3) (kz), 20.410 (3) (m), 20.410 (3) (n), 20.410 (3) (q), 20.437 (1) (kp), 20.437 (3), 48.526 (title), 48.526 (2) (title), 48.526 (2) (a), 48.526 (2) (b), 48.526 (2m), 48.526 (3) (title), 48.526 (3) (a), 48.526 (6) (title), 48.526 (6) (b), 48.526 (7) (a) to (h), 48.526 (8), 48.528 (title), 48.528 (2), 48.528 (3), 301.03 (10) (a), 301.03 (10) (b), 301.03 (10) (d), 301.03 (10) (e), 301.03 (10) (f), 301.20, 301.26 (4) (title), 301.26 (4) (cm) 3., 301.26 (4) (d) 5., 301.26 (4) (f), 301.37 (5), 938.48 (3), 938.48 (4), 938.48 (4m), 938.48 (5), 938.48 (6) and 938.48 (13); to renumber and amend 20.410 (3) (cg), 20.410 (3) (g), 20.410 (3) (hm), 20.410 (3) (ho), 20.410 (3) (hr), 20.437 (1) (cj), 20.437 (1) (cm), 48.526 (1), 48.526 (2) (c), 48.526 (3) (c), 48.526 (3) (dm), 48.526 (3) (e), 48.526 (3) (em), 48.526 (6) (a), 48.526 (7) (intro.), 48.528 (1), 301.025, 301.03 (10) (c), 301.03 (10) (g), 301.08 (1) (b) 3., 301.205, 301.26 (4) (a), 301.26 (4) (b), 301.26 (4) (bm), 301.26 (4) (c), 301.26 (4) (cm) 1., 301.26 (4) (ct), 301.26 (4) (cx), 301.26 (4) (d) 1., 301.26 (4) (d) 1m., 301.26 (4) (d) 2., 301.26 (4) (d) 3., 301.26 (4) (d) 4., 301.26 (4) (dt), 301.26 (4) (e), 301.26 (4) (ed), 301.26 (4) (eg), 301.26 (4) (g), 301.335, 938.48 (14) and 938.54; to amend 14.92, 16.51 (7), 16.54 (12) (b), 16.54 (12) (d), 20.437 (1) (kz), 20.437 (1) (o), 20.505 (8) (hm) 21d., 20.866 (1) (u), 20.921 (2) (a), 46.03 (18) (a), 46.057 (1), 46.057 (2), 46.20 (3), 46.206 (1) (a), 46.21 (2) (j), 46.21 (5) (b), 46.215 (1) (d), 46.215 (2) (a) 1., 46.215 (2) (a) 2., 46.215 (2) (c) 1., 46.215 (2) (c) 2., 46.215 (3), 46.22 (1) (b) 1. b., 46.22 (1) (b) 2. a., 46.22 (1) (b) 2. c., 46.22 (1) (b) 5m. a., 46.22 (1) (e) 3. a., 46.22 (1) (e) 3. b., 46.22 (2g) (d) 2., 46.22 (2g) (d) 3., 46.23 (5) (a) 1., 46.23 (5) (a) 2., 46.23 (5) (c) 1., 46.23 (5) (c) 2., 46.23 (5) (n) 1., 46.23 (5) (n) 2., 46.23 (5m) (c), 46.23 (6) (a) (intro.), 48.02 (10r), 49.175 (1) (intro.), 49.175 (3), 49.275, 49.32 (1) (a), 49.32 (2) (b), 49.32 (2) (d), 49.325 (1) (a), 49.325 (2), 49.325 (2g) (a), 49.325 (2g) (b), 49.325 (2g) (c), 49.325 (2r) (a) 1., 49.325 (2r) (a) 2., 49.34 (1), 49.34 (2), 49.35 (1) (a), 49.35 (1) (b), 49.35 (2), 49.45 (6m) (br) 1., 49.45 (25) (bj), 49.855 (3), 49.855 (4m) (b), 59.24, 102.27 (2) (a), 230.08 (2) (e) 2m., 230.08 (2) (e) 3e., 301.001, 301.01 (4), 301.03 (9), 301.035 (2), 301.035 (4), 301.07, 301.08 (2) (a), 301.27 (1), 301.36 (1), 301.37 (1), 302.31 (7), 302.386 (1), 302.386 (2) (intro.), 302.386 (3) (a), 303.01 (2) (em), 303.01 (11) (a) 1., 701.0503 (2) (intro.), 767.59 (1f) (b) 4., 767.59 (2) (c), 767.59 (2s), 859.07 (2) (a) 2., 859.15, 938.02 (4), 938.02 (10r), 938.02 (12r), 938.02 (19r), 938.06 (4), 938.069 (1) (intro.), 938.069 (2), 938.08 (3) (a) (intro.), 938.205 (1) (c), 938.208 (1) (intro.), 938.209 (1) (a) (intro.), 938.209 (1) (a) 1., 938.209 (2m) (b), 938.22 (1) (a), 938.22 (2) (a), 938.22 (2) (b), 938.222 (2) (a) 1., 938.222 (2) (b) 3., 938.222 (2) (b) 4., 938.223 (2) (a) 1., 938.223 (2) (b) 3., 938.223 (2) (b) 4., 938.224 (1), 938.224 (2) (a) 1., 938.224 (2) (a) 2., 938.224 (2) (b), 938.224 (3) (a), 938.224 (3) (b), 938.224 (4), 938.225, 938.23 (1m) (a), 938.295 (2) (c), 938.296 (6), 938.30 (6) (b), 938.31 (7) (b), 938.33 (4m) (intro.), 938.33 (4m) (b), 938.34 (2) (a), 938.34 (2) (b), 938.34 (3) (f) (intro.), 938.34 (4m) (intro.), 938.34 (4n) (intro.), 938.34 (6s), 938.34 (8d) (c), 938.355 (6) (d) 1., 938.355 (6d) (a) 1., 938.355 (6d) (a) 2., 938.355 (6d) (b) 1., 938.355 (6d) (b) 2., 938.355 (6m) (a) 1g., 938.357 (4) (a), 938.357 (4) (b) 1., 938.357 (4) (b) 2., 938.357 (4) (b) 4., 938.357 (4) (c) 1., 938.357 (4) (c) 2., 938.357 (4) (c) 4., 938.357 (4g) (a), 938.357 (4g) (b), 938.357 (4m), 938.357 (5) (a), 938.357 (5) (g), 938.357 (5m) (a), 938.36 (1) (a), 938.36 (2), 938.363 (1) (c), 938.363 (2), 938.38 (1) (a), 938.396 (2g) (b) 1., 938.485 (1), 938.485 (4), 938.485 (5), 938.49 (title), 938.49 (1), 938.49 (2) (intro.), 938.49 (2) (a), 938.50, 938.505 (1), 938.505 (2) (a) (intro.), 938.505 (2) (b), 938.51 (1) (intro.), 938.51 (1d) (intro.), 938.51 (1m), 938.51 (2), 938.51 (3), 938.51 (4) (intro.), 938.52 (title), 938.52 (1) (intro.), 938.52 (1) (f), 938.52 (2), 938.52 (4), 938.53, 938.533 (2) (intro.), 938.533 (3), 938.533 (4), 938.534 (1) (b) 1., 938.534 (1) (b) 2., 938.534 (2), 938.535, 938.538 (2) (intro.), 938.538 (3) (a) (intro.), 938.538 (3) (a) 9., 938.538 (4), 938.538 (5) (a), 938.538 (5) (b), 938.538 (6), 938.538 (7), 938.539 (2), 938.539 (6), 938.549 (1) (intro.), 938.57 (1) (g), 938.57 (4), 938.78 (1) and 938.78 (3); and to create 20.437 (4) (o), 938.226, 938.227, 938.485 (10) (title) and 938.485 (18) of the statutes; Relating to: the transfer of juvenile correctional services from the Department of Corrections to the Department of Children and Families and granting rule-making authority. (FE)
Title
The transfer of juvenile correctional services from the Department of Corrections to the Department of Children and Families and granting rule-making authority. (FE)
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-03-28 | House | Failed to pass pursuant to Senate Joint Resolution 1 |
2017-10-05 | House | Fiscal estimate received |
2017-09-21 | House | Fiscal estimate received |
2017-08-21 | House | Fiscal estimate received |
2017-08-21 | House | Fiscal estimate received |
2017-08-14 | House | Representative Spreitzer added as a coauthor |
2017-08-07 | House | Read first time and referred to Committee on Corrections |
2017-08-07 | House | Introduced |
Wisconsin State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://docs.legis.wisconsin.gov/2017/proposals/reg/asm/bill/ab465 |
Text | https://docs.legis.wisconsin.gov/document/proposaltext/2017/REG/AB465.pdf |