WI AB463 | 2011-2012 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 10-0)
Status: Failed on March 23 2012 - 100% progression
Action: 2012-03-23 - Failed to pass pursuant to Senate Joint Resolution 1
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 10-0)
Status: Failed on March 23 2012 - 100% progression
Action: 2012-03-23 - Failed to pass pursuant to Senate Joint Resolution 1
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
An Act to repeal 23.321 (2) (a), 23.321 (3) (a), 23.321 (4) (a) 1., 30.28 (2) (title), 30.28 (2) (a) (intro.), 30.28 (2) (a) 1., 30.28 (2) (a) 2., 30.28 (2) (a) 3., 30.28 (2m) (c), 31.39 (2m) (c), 281.22 (1), 281.22 (2) (c), 281.22 (4), 281.36 (1) (am), 281.36 (1) (bg), 281.36 (1) (c) and (cm), 281.36 (1) (cr), 281.36 (1m), 281.36 (2) (title), 281.36 (2) (b), 281.36 (7), 281.36 (8) (title), 281.36 (8) (a), 281.36 (8) (b), 281.36 (8) (bn) 2., 281.36 (8) (c), 281.36 (8) (d), 281.36 (8) (e), 281.36 (9) (am) to (c), 281.36 (10) (b), 281.37 (title), 281.37 (1) (intro.), 281.37 (1) (a), 281.37 (1) (e), 281.37 (1) (f), 281.37 (2), 281.37 (3) (g), 281.37 (3) (j), 281.37 (3m) and 281.37 (4); to renumber 30.28 (2) (b) 1., 30.28 (2) (b) 2., 281.22 (2) (title), 281.22 (2m) (title) and 281.22 (2m) (a) 2.; to renumber and amend 30.28 (1), 281.22 (title), 281.22 (2) (a), 281.22 (2) (b), 281.22 (2) (d), 281.22 (2m) (a) (intro.), 281.22 (2m) (a) 1., 281.22 (2m) (b), 281.22 (3), 281.36 (2) (a), 281.36 (3), 281.36 (8) (bn) 1., 281.37 (1) (b), 281.37 (1) (d), 281.37 (2m), 281.37 (3) (intro.), 281.37 (3) (a), 281.37 (3) (b), 281.37 (3) (c), 281.37 (3) (d), 281.37 (3) (e), 281.37 (3) (f), 281.37 (3) (h), 281.37 (3) (i) and 281.37 (5); to consolidate, renumber and amend 281.36 (10) (intro.) and (a); to amend 20.370 (4) (bi), 23.321 (title), 30.025 (1b) (b), 30.03 (4) (a), 30.2022 (2), 30.207 (7) (a), 30.28 (title), 30.28 (2m) (a), 30.28 (2m) (am), 30.28 (2m) (b), 30.28 (2m) (d), 30.28 (2r) (a) (intro.), 30.28 (2r) (a) 1., 30.28 (2r) (b), 281.165 (4) (a) 1m., 281.36 (4) (intro.), 281.36 (4) (b), 281.36 (4) (e) 1., 281.36 (4) (e) 2., 281.36 (4) (e) 3., 281.36 (5) (intro.), 281.36 (5) (a), 281.36 (5) (b), 281.36 (6) (a) 1., 281.36 (9) (a) (intro.), 281.36 (9) (a) 1., 281.36 (9) (a) 2., 281.36 (9) (a) 3., 281.98 (1) and 814.04 (intro.); to repeal and recreate 281.36 (title); and to create 20.370 (4) (bm), 23.321 (1) (title), 23.321 (2) (title), 23.321 (2m) (title), 23.321 (3) (title), 23.321 (3m), 23.321 (4) (title), 23.321 (5) (title), 23.321 (6) (title), 30.28 (1) (a), 30.28 (1) (b), 30.28 (1m), 227.01 (13) (ru), 281.17 (10) (c), 281.36 (1) (bd), 281.36 (1) (bj), 281.36 (1) (cp), 281.36 (3b) (title), 281.36 (3b) (a), 281.36 (3g) (title), 281.36 (3g) (a), 281.36 (3g) (c), 281.36 (3g) (d), 281.36 (3g) (e), 281.36 (3g) (f), 281.36 (3g) (fg), 281.36 (3g) (fm), 281.36 (3g) (fr), 281.36 (3g) (g), 281.36 (3g) (h), 281.36 (3g) (i), 281.36 (3m), 281.36 (3n), 281.36 (3p), 281.36 (3r), 281.36 (9) (d) and (e), 281.36 (11), 281.36 (12) (a), 281.36 (12) (b), 281.36 (13) and 281.36 (14) of the statutes; relating to: permits for discharges into wetlands; wetland mitigation; wetland mapping and delineation; fees for permits and other authorizations or determinations by the Department of Natural Resources relating to structures, deposits, and other activities in or near navigable waters; making appropriations; and providing penalties. (FE)
Title
Permits for discharges into wetlands; wetland mitigation; wetland mapping and delineation; fees for permits and other authorizations or determinations by the Department of Natural Resources relating to structures, deposits, and other activities in or near navigable waters; making appropriations; and providing penalties. (FE)
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2012-03-23 | House | Failed to pass pursuant to Senate Joint Resolution 1 |
2012-02-21 | House | Laid on the table |
2012-02-21 | House | LRB correction |
2012-02-17 | House | LRB correction |
2012-02-16 | House | Made a special order of business at 11:01 a.m. on 2-21-2012 pursuant to Assembly Resolution 21 |
2012-02-14 | House | Placed on calendar 2-16-2012 by committee on Rules |
2012-01-24 | House | Assembly amendment 11 offered by Representative Mursau |
2012-01-24 | House | Referred to committee on Rules |
2012-01-24 | House | Report passage as amended recommended by committee on Natural Resources, Ayes 10, Noes 6 |
2012-01-24 | House | Report Assembly Amendment 10 adoption recommended by committee on Natural Resources, Ayes 16, Noes 0 |
2012-01-24 | House | Report Assembly Amendment 1 adoption recommended by committee on Natural Resources, Ayes 14, Noes 2 |
2012-01-19 | House | Fiscal estimate received |
2012-01-18 | House | Assembly amendment 10 offered by committee on Natural Resources |
2012-01-18 | House | Executive action taken |
2012-01-18 | House | LRB correction |
2012-01-18 | House | LRB correction |
2012-01-18 | House | Assembly amendment 9 offered by Representatives Molepske Jr and Mason |
2012-01-18 | House | Assembly amendment 8 offered by Representatives Molepske Jr and Mason |
2012-01-18 | House | Assembly amendment 7 offered by Representatives Molepske Jr and Mason |
2012-01-18 | House | Assembly amendment 6 offered by Representatives Molepske Jr and Mason |
2012-01-18 | House | Assembly amendment 5 offered by Representatives Molepske Jr and Mason |
2012-01-18 | House | Assembly amendment 4 offered by Representatives Molepske Jr and Mason |
2012-01-18 | House | Assembly amendment 3 offered by Representatives Molepske Jr and Mason |
2012-01-18 | House | Assembly amendment 2 offered by Representatives Molepske Jr and Mason |
2012-01-17 | House | Assembly amendment 1 offered by Representative Mursau |
2012-01-10 | House | Public hearing held |
2012-01-06 | House | Read first time and referred to committee on Natural Resources |
2012-01-06 | House | Introduced |
Wisconsin State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://docs.legis.wisconsin.gov/2011/proposals/reg/asm/bill/ab463 |
Text | https://docs.legis.wisconsin.gov/document/proposaltext/2011/REG/AB463.pdf |