WI AB454 | 2015-2016 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 5-0)
Status: Engrossed on January 12 2016 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2016-04-13 - Failed to concur in pursuant to Senate Joint Resolution 1
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on January 12 2016 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2016-04-13 - Failed to concur in pursuant to Senate Joint Resolution 1
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
An Act Relating to: modifying and repealing various rules promulgated by the Department of Transportation. (FE)
Title
Modifying and repealing various rules promulgated by the Department of Transportation. (FE)
Sponsors
Rep. Keith Ripp [R] | Sen. Joan Ballweg [R] | Rep. Thomas Weatherston [R] | Rep. David Murphy [R] |
Sen. Jerry Petrowski [R] |
Roll Calls
2016-01-12 - House - Assembly: Assembly Amendment 3 laid on table (Y: 61 N: 35 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2016-04-13 | Senate | Failed to concur in pursuant to Senate Joint Resolution 1 |
2016-01-20 | Senate | Referred to committee on Senate Organization |
2016-01-19 | Senate | Placed on calendar 1-20-2016 pursuant to Senate Rule 18(1) |
2016-01-19 | Senate | Public hearing requirement waived by committee on Senate Organization, pursuant to Senate Rule 18 (1m), Ayes 3, Noes 2 |
2016-01-15 | Senate | Available for scheduling |
2016-01-15 | Senate | Read first time and referred to committee on Senate Organization |
2016-01-13 | Senate | Received from Assembly |
2016-01-12 | House | Ordered immediately messaged |
2016-01-12 | House | Read a third time and passed |
2016-01-12 | House | Rules suspended |
2016-01-12 | House | Ordered to a third reading |
2016-01-12 | House | Assembly Amendment 3 laid on table, Ayes 61, Noes 35 |
2016-01-12 | House | Assembly Amendment 3 offered by Representative Riemer |
2016-01-12 | House | Assembly Amendment 2 withdrawn and returned to author |
2016-01-12 | House | Assembly Amendment 1 adopted |
2016-01-12 | House | Read a second time |
2016-01-07 | House | Assembly Amendment 2 offered by Representative Ripp |
2016-01-07 | House | Placed on calendar 1-12-2016 by Committee on Rules |
2015-12-10 | House | Referred to committee on Rules |
2015-12-10 | House | Report passage as amended recommended by Committee on Transportation, Ayes 14, Noes 0 |
2015-12-10 | House | Report Assembly Amendment 1 adoption recommended by Committee on Transportation, Ayes 13, Noes 0 |
2015-12-08 | House | Executive action taken |
2015-12-07 | House | Assembly Amendment 1 offered by Representative Ripp |
2015-11-17 | House | Fiscal estimate received |
2015-10-28 | House | Public hearing held |
2015-10-26 | House | Representative Knodl added as a coauthor |
2015-10-23 | House | Read first time and referred to Committee on Transportation |
2015-10-23 | House | Introduced |