WI AB454 | 2013-2014 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on February 6 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-02-06 - Published 2-7-2014
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on February 6 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-02-06 - Published 2-7-2014
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
An Act to create 20.235 (1) (fp), 39.385 and 71.05 (6) (b) 51. of the statutes; Relating to: creation of a primary care and psychiatry shortage grant program, exempting from taxation amounts received from such a grant program, granting rule-making authority, and making an appropriation. (FE)
Title
Creation of a primary care and psychiatry shortage grant program, exempting from taxation amounts received from such a grant program, granting rule-making authority, and making an appropriation. (FE)
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2014-01-22 - Senate - Senate: Read a third time and concurred in (Y: 31 N: 1 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-11-12 - House - Assembly: Read a third time and passed (Y: 93 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-11-12 - House - Assembly: Read a third time and passed (Y: 93 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2014-02-06 | House | Published 2-7-2014 |
2014-02-06 | House | Report approved by the Governor on 2-6-2014. 2013 Wisconsin Act 128 |
2014-01-30 | House | Presented to the Governor on 1-30-2014 |
2014-01-30 | House | Report correctly enrolled on 1-30-2014 |
2014-01-22 | House | Received from Senate concurred in |
2014-01-22 | Senate | Ordered immediately messaged |
2014-01-22 | Senate | Read a third time and concurred in, Ayes 31, Noes 1 |
2014-01-22 | Senate | Rules suspended |
2014-01-22 | Senate | Ordered to a third reading |
2014-01-22 | Senate | Read a second time |
2014-01-16 | Senate | Placed on calendar 1-22-2014 pursuant to Senate Rule 18(1) |
2014-01-16 | Senate | Public hearing requirement waived by committee on Senate Organization, pursuant to Senate Rule 18 (1m), Ayes 5, Noes 0 |
2014-01-08 | Senate | Available for scheduling |
2014-01-08 | Senate | Report concurrence recommended by Joint Committee on Finance, Ayes 14, Noes 1 |
2014-01-08 | Senate | Executive action taken |
2013-12-02 | Senate | Fiscal estimate received |
2013-11-14 | Senate | Read first time and referred to joint committee on Finance |
2013-11-13 | Senate | Received from Assembly |
2013-11-12 | House | Ordered immediately messaged |
2013-11-12 | House | Representative Barca added as a coauthor |
2013-11-12 | House | Read a third time and passed, Ayes 93, Noes 0, Paired 2 |
2013-11-12 | House | Rules suspended |
2013-11-12 | House | Ordered to a third reading |
2013-11-12 | House | Assembly Amendment 2 adopted |
2013-11-12 | House | Assembly Amendment 1 adopted |
2013-11-12 | House | Read a second time |
2013-11-07 | House | Placed on calendar 11-12-2013 by Committee on Rules |
2013-11-06 | House | Assembly Amendment 2 offered by Representative Petersen |
2013-11-06 | House | Referred to Committee on Rules |
2013-11-06 | House | Report passage as amended recommended by Committee on Health, Ayes 9, Noes 0 |
2013-11-06 | House | Report Assembly Amendment 1 adoption recommended by Committee on Health, Ayes 9, Noes 0 |
2013-11-05 | House | Executive action taken |
2013-11-01 | House | Representative Doyle added as a coauthor |
2013-10-24 | House | Assembly Amendment 1 offered by Representative Petersen |
2013-10-24 | House | Fiscal estimate received |
2013-10-22 | House | Public hearing held |
2013-10-21 | House | LRB correction |
2013-10-18 | House | Read first time and referred to Committee on Health |
2013-10-18 | House | Introduced |