WI AB454 | 2009-2010 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 7-2)
Status: Engrossed on February 16 2010 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2010-04-28 - Failed to concur in pursuant to Senate Joint Resolution 1
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on February 16 2010 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2010-04-28 - Failed to concur in pursuant to Senate Joint Resolution 1
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
An Act to amend 7.08 (2) (c), 7.08 (2) (cm), 8.20 (2) (a) and 8.20 (2) (c) of the statutes; relating to: information concerning independent candidates for partisan office that appears on the ballot at elections.
Title
Information concerning independent candidates for partisan office that appears on the ballot at elections.
Sponsors
Rep. Steve Hilgenberg [D] | Rep. Andrew Jorgensen [D] | Sen. Neal Kedzie [R] | Sen. John Lehman [D] |
Sen. Jeff Smith [D] | Rep. Jeff Stone [R] | Sen. Lena Taylor [D] | Rep. Amy Vruwink [D] |
Rep. Annette Williams [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2010-04-28 | Failed to concur in pursuant to Senate Joint Resolution 1 | |
2010-04-09 | Available for scheduling | |
2010-04-09 | Report concurrence recommended by committee on Labor, Elections and Urban Affairs, Ayes 5, Noes 0 | |
2010-04-08 | Executive action taken | |
2010-03-16 | Public hearing held | |
2010-02-18 | Read first time and referred to committee on Labor, Elections and Urban Affairs | |
2010-02-17 | Received from Assembly | |
2010-02-16 | Ordered immediately messaged | |
2010-02-16 | Read a third time and passed | |
2010-02-16 | Rules suspended | |
2010-02-16 | Ordered to a third reading | |
2010-02-16 | Assembly amendment 1 adopted | |
2010-02-16 | Read a second time | |
2010-02-10 | Placed on calendar 2-16-2010 by committee on Rules | |
2009-12-18 | Referred to committee on Rules | |
2009-12-18 | Report passage as amended recommended by committee on Elections and Campaign Reform, Ayes 8, Noes 0 | |
2009-12-18 | Report Assembly Amendment 1 adoption recommended by committee on Elections and Campaign Reform, Ayes 8, Noes 0 | |
2009-12-15 | Executive action taken | |
2009-11-17 | Public hearing held | |
2009-11-11 | Assembly amendment 1 offered by Representative Smith | |
2009-09-25 | Read first time and referred to committee on Elections and Campaign Reform | |
2009-09-25 | Introduced |
Wisconsin State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://docs.legis.wisconsin.gov/2009/proposals/reg/asm/bill/ab454 |
Text | https://docs.legis.wisconsin.gov/document/proposaltext/2009/REG/AB454.pdf |