WI AB44 | 2021-2022 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 22-3)
Status: Failed on March 15 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-03-15 - Failed to pass pursuant to Senate Joint Resolution 1
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 22-3)
Status: Failed on March 15 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-03-15 - Failed to pass pursuant to Senate Joint Resolution 1
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
An Act to repeal 940.19 (6) (a); to renumber 813.125 (1) (am) 1. and 813.125 (1) (am) 2.; to consolidate, renumber and amend 940.19 (6) (intro.) and (b); to amend 48.57 (3p) (g) 2., 48.685 (1) (c) 2., 50.065 (1) (e) 1., 103.34 (1) (b) 2., 165.84 (7) (ab) 1., 301.048 (2) (bm) 1. a., 302.11 (1g) (a) 2., 303.07 (2), 813.123 (1) (eg), 813.125 (1) (am) (intro.), 895.45 (1) (a), 911.01 (4) (c), 938.208 (1) (a), 938.34 (4m) (b) 1., 938.355 (2d) (b) 3., 939.62 (2m) (a) 2m. b., 939.632 (1) (e) 1., 941.29 (1g) (a), 941.291 (1) (b), 949.03 (1) (b), 968.20 (title), 968.20 (1), 968.20 (1h), 968.26 (1b) (a) 2. a., 969.035 (1), 969.08 (10) (b), 973.01 (2) (c) 2. a., 973.0135 (1) (b) 2., 973.06 (1) (av) 2. a., 973.06 (1) (av) 2. b., 973.123 (1) and 980.01 (6) (b); and to create 343.12 (7) (c) 9j., 813.12 (1) (ar), 813.12 (5b), 813.123 (6g), 813.125 (1) (am) 3., 813.125 (1) (am) 4. (intro.), 813.125 (5b), 939.623, 940.198, 940.225 (1) (d) and 971.109 of the statutes; Relating to: increased penalties for crimes against elder persons; restraining orders for elder persons; freezing assets of a defendant charged with financial exploitation of an elder person; sexual assault of an elder person; physical abuse of an elder person; and providing a penalty.
Title
Increased penalties for crimes against elder persons; restraining orders for elder persons; freezing assets of a defendant charged with financial exploitation of an elder person; sexual assault of an elder person; physical abuse of an elder person; and providing a penalty.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-03-15 | House | Failed to pass pursuant to Senate Joint Resolution 1 |
2021-05-11 | House | Representative S. Rodriguez added as a coauthor |
2021-05-11 | House | Laid on the table |
2021-05-10 | House | Representative Subeck added as a coauthor |
2021-05-06 | House | Placed on calendar 5-11-2021 by Committee on Rules |
2021-03-25 | House | Referred to committee on Rules |
2021-03-25 | House | Report passage recommended by Committee on Criminal Justice and Public Safety, Ayes 13, Noes 1 |
2021-03-10 | House | Executive action taken |
2021-03-10 | House | Representatives Stubbs and Bowen added as coauthors |
2021-03-09 | House | Assembly Amendment 1 offered by Representative McGuire |
2021-02-24 | House | Public hearing held |
2021-02-11 | House | Representative James added as a coauthor |
2021-02-10 | House | Read first time and referred to Committee on Criminal Justice and Public Safety |
2021-02-10 | House | Introduced |