WI AB438 | 2019-2020 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 17-9)
Status: Failed on April 1 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-04-01 - Failed to pass pursuant to Senate Joint Resolution 1
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 17-9)
Status: Failed on April 1 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-04-01 - Failed to pass pursuant to Senate Joint Resolution 1
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
An Act to amend 49.45 (9r) (a) 7. b., 146.81 (1) (dg), 146.997 (1) (d) 4., 154.01 (3), 155.01 (7), 252.14 (1) (ar) 4e., 440.03 (9) (a) (intro.), 440.03 (9) (a) 2., 440.03 (13) (b) (intro.), 440.15, 446.01 (1v) (d), 448.50 (3) and (3m), 448.51, 448.56 (2), 448.565, 448.57 (2) (intro.), (c), (d) and (e), (4) and (5), 448.956 (1m) and (4), 450.10 (3) (a) 5., 451.02 (1) and 462.04; to repeal and recreate 440.03 (13) (b) (intro.) and 440.15; and to create 14.88, 440.03 (11m) (c) 2m., 448.50 (1n) and (1o), subchapter IX of chapter 448 [precedes 448.985] and 448.986 of the statutes; Relating to: ratification of the Physical Therapy Licensure Compact, extending the time limit for emergency rule procedures, providing an exemption from emergency rule procedures, and granting rule-making authority. (FE)
Title
Ratification of the Physical Therapy Licensure Compact, extending the time limit for emergency rule procedures, providing an exemption from emergency rule procedures, and granting rule-making authority. (FE)
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-04-01 | House | Failed to pass pursuant to Senate Joint Resolution 1 |
2020-01-28 | House | Referred to committee on Rules |
2020-01-28 | House | Report passage as amended recommended by Committee on Health, Ayes 15, Noes 0 |
2020-01-28 | House | Report Assembly Amendment 1 adoption recommended by Committee on Health, Ayes 15, Noes 0 |
2020-01-15 | House | Executive action taken |
2020-01-15 | House | Representative Vining added as a coauthor |
2019-10-29 | House | Representative Edming added as a coauthor |
2019-10-29 | House | Public hearing held |
2019-10-24 | House | Assembly Amendment 1 offered by Representative Stafsholt |
2019-09-25 | House | Fiscal estimate received |
2019-09-24 | House | Representative Considine added as a coauthor |
2019-09-12 | House | Read first time and referred to Committee on Health |
2019-09-12 | House | Introduced |
Wisconsin State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://docs.legis.wisconsin.gov/2019/proposals/reg/asm/bill/ab438 |
Text | https://docs.legis.wisconsin.gov/document/proposaltext/2019/REG/AB438.pdf |