WI AB426 | 2019-2020 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 11-5)
Status: Passed on November 20 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-11-20 - Published 11-21-2019
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 11-5)
Status: Passed on November 20 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-11-20 - Published 11-21-2019
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
An Act to amend 943.01 (2k) (a) 1. a., 943.01 (2k) (a) 3., 943.143 (1) (a) 1. a., 943.143 (1) (a) 3. and 943.143 (1) (b); and to create 943.01 (2k) (a) 6., 943.01 (2k) (c), 943.143 (1) (a) 6. and 943.143 (3) of the statutes; Relating to: trespassing on the property of an energy provider and providing a penalty.
Title
Trespassing on the property of an energy provider and providing a penalty.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2019-11-05 - Senate - Senate: Senate Amendment 1 rejected (Y: 19 N: 14 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-11-20 | House | Published 11-21-2019 |
2019-11-20 | House | Report approved by the Governor on 11-20-2019. 2019 Wisconsin Act 33 |
2019-11-14 | House | Presented to the Governor on 11-14-2019 by directive of the Speaker |
2019-11-13 | House | Report correctly enrolled on 11-13-2019 |
2019-11-13 | House | LRB correction |
2019-11-06 | House | Received from Senate concurred in |
2019-11-05 | Senate | Ordered immediately messaged |
2019-11-05 | Senate | Read a third time and concurred in |
2019-11-05 | Senate | Rules suspended |
2019-11-05 | Senate | Ordered to a third reading |
2019-11-05 | Senate | Senate Amendment 1 rejected, Ayes 19, Noes 14 |
2019-11-05 | Senate | Read a second time |
2019-11-05 | Senate | Senate Amendment 1 offered by Senators Larson, Carpenter, Risser, Smith, Hansen and Johnson |
2019-11-01 | Senate | Placed on calendar 11-5-2019 pursuant to Senate Rule 18(1) |
2019-11-01 | Senate | Public hearing requirement waived by committee on Senate Organization, pursuant to Senate Rule 18 (1m), Ayes 3, Noes 2 |
2019-10-31 | Senate | Available for scheduling |
2019-10-31 | Senate | Read first time and referred to committee on Senate Organization |
2019-10-28 | Senate | Representative Wittke added as a coauthor |
2019-10-11 | Senate | Received from Assembly |
2019-10-10 | House | Ordered immediately messaged |
2019-10-10 | House | Read a third time and passed |
2019-10-10 | House | Rules suspended |
2019-10-10 | House | Ordered to a third reading |
2019-10-10 | House | Assembly Amendment 1 adopted |
2019-10-10 | House | Read a second time |
2019-10-08 | House | Placed on calendar 10-10-2019 by Committee on Rules |
2019-10-04 | House | Referred to committee on Rules |
2019-10-04 | House | Report passage as amended recommended by Committee on Energy and Utilities, Ayes 14, Noes 0 |
2019-10-04 | House | Report Assembly Amendment 1 adoption recommended by Committee on Energy and Utilities, Ayes 14, Noes 0 |
2019-10-02 | House | Executive action taken |
2019-10-01 | House | Assembly Amendment 1 offered by Representatives Steffen and Crowley |
2019-09-26 | House | Public hearing held |
2019-09-17 | House | Representative Dittrich added as a coauthor |
2019-09-12 | House | Read first time and referred to Committee on Energy and Utilities |
2019-09-12 | House | Introduced |