WI AB399 | 2015-2016 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 32-0)
Status: Failed on April 13 2016 - 100% progression
Action: 2016-04-13 - Failed to pass pursuant to Senate Joint Resolution 1
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 32-0)
Status: Failed on April 13 2016 - 100% progression
Action: 2016-04-13 - Failed to pass pursuant to Senate Joint Resolution 1
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
An Act to create 71.07 (8m) and 71.10 (4) (cs) of the statutes; Relating to: creating a nonrefundable individual income tax credit based on the federal tax credit for certain expenses for household and dependent care services. (FE)
Title
Creating a nonrefundable individual income tax credit based on the federal tax credit for certain expenses for household and dependent care services. (FE)
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2016-01-19 - House - Assembly: Refused to suspend rules to withdraw from committee on Ways and Means and take up (Y: 37 N: 59 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2016-04-13 | House | Failed to pass pursuant to Senate Joint Resolution 1 |
2016-01-19 | House | Refused to suspend rules to withdraw from committee on Ways and Means and take up, Ayes 37, Noes 59 |
2015-10-28 | House | Senator Harris Dodd added as a cosponsor |
2015-10-19 | House | Fiscal estimate received |
2015-10-13 | House | Read first time and referred to Committee on Ways and Means |
2015-10-13 | House | Introduced |