WI AB391 | 2013-2014 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Failed on April 8 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-04-08 - Failed to pass pursuant to Senate Joint Resolution 1
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Failed on April 8 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-04-08 - Failed to pass pursuant to Senate Joint Resolution 1
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
An Act to create 100.415 of the statutes; Relating to: the display and sale of novelty lighters and providing a penalty. (FE)
Title
The display and sale of novelty lighters and providing a penalty. (FE)
Sponsors
Rep. Scott Krug [R] | Rep. Garey Bies [R] | Rep. Alvin Ott [R] | Rep. Dana Wachs [D] |
Rep. Tom Larson [R] | Rep. Amy Loudenbeck [R] | Rep. Amy Vruwink [D] | Rep. Christine Sinicki [D] |
Sen. Julie Lassa [D] | Sen. John Lehman [D] |
Roll Calls
2014-03-20 - House - Assembly: Refused to suspend rules to withdraw from committee on Rules and take up (Y: 39 N: 52 NV: 8 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2014-04-08 | House | Failed to pass pursuant to Senate Joint Resolution 1 |
2014-03-20 | House | Refused to suspend rules to withdraw from committee on Rules and take up, Ayes 39, Noes 52 |
2014-02-11 | House | Referred to Committee on Rules |
2014-02-11 | House | Report passage as amended recommended by Committee on Consumer Protection, Ayes 9, Noes 0 |
2014-02-11 | House | Report Assembly Amendment 1 adoption recommended by Committee on Consumer Protection, Ayes 7, Noes 0 |
2014-02-11 | House | Executive action taken |
2014-02-05 | House | Representative Wright added as a coauthor |
2014-02-04 | House | Public hearing held |
2013-11-05 | House | Assembly Amendment 1 offered by Representative Krug |
2013-10-08 | House | Fiscal estimate received |
2013-09-26 | House | Read first time and referred to Committee on Consumer Protection |
2013-09-26 | House | Introduced |