WI AB37 | 2015-2016 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on July 1 2015 - 100% progression
Action: 2015-07-01 - Published 7-2-2015
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on July 1 2015 - 100% progression
Action: 2015-07-01 - Published 7-2-2015
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
An Act to create 254.71 (1m) of the statutes; Relating to: requiring certain persons to hold certificates of food protection practices in order to operate certain school lunchrooms participating in the National School Lunch Program. (FE)
Title
Requiring certain persons to hold certificates of food protection practices in order to operate certain school lunchrooms participating in the National School Lunch Program. (FE)
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2015-03-17 - House - Assembly: Assembly Amendment 3 laid on table (Y: 63 N: 35 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2015-07-01 | House | Published 7-2-2015 |
2015-07-01 | House | Report approved by the Governor on 7-1-2015. 2015 Wisconsin Act 46 |
2015-06-30 | House | Presented to the Governor on 6-30-2015 |
2015-06-18 | House | Report correctly enrolled on 6-18-2015 |
2015-06-09 | House | Received from Senate concurred in |
2015-06-09 | Senate | Ordered immediately messaged |
2015-06-09 | Senate | Read a third time and concurred in |
2015-06-09 | Senate | Rules suspended |
2015-06-09 | Senate | Ordered to a third reading |
2015-06-09 | Senate | Read a second time |
2015-06-08 | Senate | Placed on calendar 6-9-2015 pursuant to Senate Rule 18(1) |
2015-06-08 | Senate | Public hearing requirement waived by committee on Senate Organization, pursuant to Senate Rule 18 (1m), Ayes 5, Noes 0 |
2015-05-22 | Senate | Available for scheduling |
2015-05-22 | Senate | Report concurrence recommended by Committee on Health and Human Services, Ayes 5, Noes 0 |
2015-05-20 | Senate | Executive session held |
2015-03-27 | Senate | Read first time and referred to committee on Health and Human Services |
2015-03-17 | Senate | Received from Assembly |
2015-03-17 | House | Ordered immediately messaged |
2015-03-17 | House | Read a third time and passed |
2015-03-17 | House | Rules suspended |
2015-03-17 | House | Ordered to a third reading |
2015-03-17 | House | Assembly Amendment 3 laid on table, Ayes 63, Noes 35 |
2015-03-17 | House | Assembly Amendment 3 offered by Representatives Zamarripa, Pope, Hebl, Berceau, Ohnstad, Meyers, Sinicki, Considine, Spreitzer, Doyle, Wachs and Shankland |
2015-03-17 | House | Assembly Amendment 1 adopted |
2015-03-17 | House | Assembly Amendment 1 to Assembly Amendment 1 adopted |
2015-03-17 | House | Read a second time |
2015-03-12 | House | Assembly Amendment 1 to Assembly Amendment 1 offered by Representative Petryk |
2015-03-12 | House | Placed on calendar 3-17-2015 by Committee on Rules |
2015-03-12 | House | Referred to committee on Rules |
2015-03-12 | House | Report passage as amended recommended by Committee on State Affairs and Government Operations, Ayes 14, Noes 1 |
2015-03-12 | House | Report Assembly Amendment 1 adoption recommended by Committee on State Affairs and Government Operations, Ayes 15, Noes 0 |
2015-03-10 | House | Executive action taken |
2015-03-09 | House | Assembly Amendment 2 offered by Representatives Zamarripa, Sinicki and Ohnstad |
2015-03-09 | House | Assembly Amendment 1 offered by Representative Petryk |
2015-03-04 | House | Public hearing held |
2015-02-23 | House | Fiscal estimate received |
2015-02-17 | House | Read first time and referred to Committee on State Affairs and Government Operations |
2015-02-17 | House | Introduced |