WI AB344 | 2015-2016 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Passed on November 11 2015 - 100% progression
Action: 2015-11-11 - Published 11-12-2015
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Passed on November 11 2015 - 100% progression
Action: 2015-11-11 - Published 11-12-2015
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
An Act to amend 66.1105 (7) (ak) 2.; and to create 66.1105 (6) (a) 13., 66.1105 (6) (am) 2. h., 66.1105 (7) (ak) 4. and 66.1105 (17) (e) of the statutes; Relating to: lengthening the time during which tax increments may be allocated and expenditures for project costs may be made for Tax Incremental District Number One in the village of Weston. (FE)
Title
Lengthening the time during which tax increments may be allocated and expenditures for project costs may be made for Tax Incremental District Number One in the village of Weston. (FE)
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2015-11-06 - Senate - Senate: Read a third time and concurred in (Y: 32 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2015-11-11 | House | Published 11-12-2015 |
2015-11-11 | House | Report approved by the Governor on 11-11-2015. 2015 Wisconsin Act 75 |
2015-11-10 | House | Presented to the Governor on 11-10-2015 |
2015-11-10 | House | Report correctly enrolled on 11-10-2015 |
2015-11-09 | House | Received from Senate concurred in |
2015-11-06 | Senate | Ordered immediately messaged |
2015-11-06 | Senate | Read a third time and concurred in, Ayes 32, Noes 0 |
2015-11-06 | Senate | Rules suspended |
2015-11-06 | Senate | Ordered to a third reading |
2015-11-06 | Senate | Read a second time |
2015-11-05 | Senate | Placed on calendar 11-6-2015 pursuant to Senate Rule 18(1) |
2015-11-05 | Senate | Public hearing requirement waived by committee on Senate Organization, pursuant to Senate Rule 18 (1m), Ayes 3, Noes 2 |
2015-11-05 | Senate | Withdrawn from joint committee on Finance and made Available for Scheduling by committee on Senate Organization, pursuant to Senate Rule 41 (1)(e), Ayes 3, Noes 2 |
2015-11-05 | Senate | Referred to joint committee on Finance by committee on Senate Organization pursuant to Senate Rule 41 (1)(e), Ayes 3, Noes 2 |
2015-11-05 | Senate | Available for scheduling |
2015-11-05 | Senate | Read first time and referred to committee on Senate Organization |
2015-11-03 | Senate | Received from Assembly |
2015-11-03 | House | Ordered immediately messaged |
2015-11-03 | House | Read a third time and passed |
2015-11-03 | House | Rules suspended |
2015-11-03 | House | Ordered to a third reading |
2015-11-03 | House | Read a second time |
2015-11-03 | House | Rules suspended to withdraw from calendar and take up |
2015-10-28 | House | Placed on calendar 11-3-2015 by Committee on Rules |
2015-10-21 | House | Referred to committee on Rules |
2015-10-21 | House | Report passage recommended by Committee on Urban and Local Affairs, Ayes 9, Noes 0 |
2015-10-20 | House | Executive action taken |
2015-10-15 | House | Representative Skowronski added as a coauthor |
2015-10-15 | House | Public hearing held |
2015-10-02 | House | Fiscal estimate received |
2015-09-23 | House | Read first time and referred to Committee on Urban and Local Affairs |
2015-09-23 | House | Introduced |