WI AB334 | 2013-2014 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 30-0)
Status: Failed on April 8 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-04-08 - Failed to pass pursuant to Senate Joint Resolution 1
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 30-0)
Status: Failed on April 8 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-04-08 - Failed to pass pursuant to Senate Joint Resolution 1
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
An Act to repeal 71.54 (1) (g) and 71.54 (2) (b) 4.; and to amend 71.54 (1) (f) (intro.), 71.54 (2) (b) 3. and 71.54 (2m) of the statutes; Relating to: restoring indexing provisions to the homestead tax credit. (FE)
Title
Restoring indexing provisions to the homestead tax credit. (FE)
Sponsors
Rep. Daniel Riemer [D] | Sen. Jeff Smith [D] | Rep. Cory Mason [D] | Rep. Gordon Hintz [D] |
Rep. Andrew Jorgensen [D] | Rep. Evan Goyke [D] | Sen. Janet Bewley [D] | Rep. Penny Schaber [D] |
Rep. Christine Sinicki [D] | Rep. Terese Berceau [D] | Rep. Josh Zepnick [D] | Rep. Jon Richards [D] |
Rep. Mandy Wright [D] | Rep. Sondy Pope [D] | Rep. Eric Genrich [D] | Rep. Chris Taylor [D] |
Rep. Leon Young [D] | Rep. Sandra Pasch [D] | Rep. Robb Kahl [D] | Rep. Dana Wachs [D] |
Rep. Fred Clark [D] | Rep. Tod Ohnstad [D] | Rep. Mandela Barnes [D] | Rep. Gary Hebl [D] |
Rep. Amy Vruwink [D] | Rep. Nick Milroy [D] | Sen. Melissa Agard [D] | Rep. Jill Billings [D] |
Rep. Peter Barca [D] | Sen. Timothy Cullen [D] |
Roll Calls
2014-02-11 - House - Assembly: Refused to suspend rules to withdraw from joint committee on Finance and take up (Y: 39 N: 59 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2014-04-08 | House | Failed to pass pursuant to Senate Joint Resolution 1 |
2014-02-11 | House | Refused to suspend rules to withdraw from joint committee on Finance and take up, Ayes 39, Noes 59 |
2013-09-16 | House | Fiscal estimate received |
2013-08-23 | House | Read first time and referred to Joint Committee on Finance |
2013-08-23 | House | Introduced |