WI AB325 | 2019-2020 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Failed on April 1 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-04-01 - Failed to concur in pursuant to Senate Joint Resolution 1
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Failed on April 1 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-04-01 - Failed to concur in pursuant to Senate Joint Resolution 1
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
An Act to amend 20.395 (2) (cq) of the statutes; Relating to: harbor assistance grant for the city of Green Bay and making an appropriation. (FE)
Title
Harbor assistance grant for the city of Green Bay and making an appropriation. (FE)
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2019-10-10 - House - Assembly: Read a third time and passed (Y: 69 N: 27 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-04-01 | Senate | Failed to concur in pursuant to Senate Joint Resolution 1 |
2019-10-25 | Senate | Available for scheduling |
2019-10-25 | Senate | Read first time and referred to committee on Senate Organization |
2019-10-11 | Senate | Received from Assembly |
2019-10-10 | House | Ordered immediately messaged |
2019-10-10 | House | Read a third time and passed, Ayes 69, Noes 27 |
2019-10-10 | House | Rules suspended |
2019-10-10 | House | Ordered to a third reading |
2019-10-10 | House | Assembly Amendment 2 adopted |
2019-10-10 | House | Read a second time |
2019-10-08 | House | Placed on calendar 10-10-2019 by Committee on Rules |
2019-10-03 | House | Referred to committee on Rules |
2019-10-03 | House | Report passage as amended recommended by Joint Committee on Finance, Ayes 12, Noes 3 |
2019-10-03 | House | Report Assembly Amendment 2 adoption recommended by Joint Committee on Finance, Ayes 12, Noes 3 |
2019-10-02 | House | Assembly Amendment 2 offered by Joint Committee on Finance |
2019-10-02 | House | Executive action taken |
2019-09-30 | House | Referred to joint committee on Finance |
2019-09-30 | House | Report passage recommended by Committee on Transportation, Ayes 9, Noes 5 |
2019-09-25 | House | Representative Macco added as a coauthor |
2019-09-24 | House | Executive action taken |
2019-09-23 | House | Assembly Amendment 1 offered by Representative Kolste |
2019-09-20 | House | Fiscal estimate received |
2019-08-13 | House | Public hearing held |
2019-07-03 | House | Read first time and referred to Committee on Transportation |
2019-07-03 | House | Introduced |