WI AB309 | 2021-2022 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 15-0)
Status: Failed on March 15 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-03-15 - Failed to pass pursuant to Senate Joint Resolution 1
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 15-0)
Status: Failed on March 15 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-03-15 - Failed to pass pursuant to Senate Joint Resolution 1
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
An Act to amend 15.04 (1) (g), 16.765 (1), 16.765 (2), 36.09 (1) (e), 36.11 (3) (a), 36.12 (1), 38.04 (13) (b), 38.23 (1), 47.02 (3m) (f), 51.90, 66.1011 (1), 66.1201 (2m), 66.1213 (3), 66.1301 (2m), 66.1331 (2m), 66.1333 (3) (e) 2., 86.195 (5) (c), 106.50 (1), 106.50 (1m) (h), 106.50 (1m) (nm), 106.50 (5m) (f) 1., 106.52 (3) (a) 1., 106.52 (3) (a) 2., 106.52 (3) (a) 3., 106.52 (3) (a) 4., 106.52 (3) (a) 5., 106.58, 111.31 (1), 111.31 (2), 111.31 (3), 111.321, 111.70 (2), 111.81 (12) (b), 111.85 (2) (b), 118.019 (2d), 118.13 (1), 118.20 (1), 118.40 (4) (b) 2., 194.025, 224.77 (1) (o), 227.10 (3) (a), 230.01 (2) (b), 230.18, 234.29, 440.45 (1), 440.45 (2), 452.14 (3) (n), 625.12 (2), 632.35 and 756.001 (3); and to create 48.82 (7), 106.50 (1m) (v), 106.52 (1) (h), 111.32 (15), 111.373 and 628.34 (3) (c) of the statutes; Relating to: prohibiting discrimination based on vaccination status. (FE)
Title
Prohibiting discrimination based on vaccination status. (FE)
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-03-15 | House | Failed to pass pursuant to Senate Joint Resolution 1 |
2022-02-21 | House | Representative Steffen added as a coauthor |
2021-12-02 | House | Representative Murphy added as a coauthor |
2021-11-15 | House | Referred to committee on Rules |
2021-11-15 | House | Report passage recommended by Committee on Constitution and Ethics, Ayes 6, Noes 3 |
2021-08-04 | House | Representative Penterman added as a coauthor |
2021-06-09 | House | Executive action taken |
2021-06-08 | House | Representative Edming added as a coauthor |
2021-06-03 | House | Fiscal estimate received |
2021-06-02 | House | Public hearing held |
2021-05-27 | House | Fiscal estimate received |
2021-05-24 | House | Representative Behnke added as a coauthor |
2021-05-20 | House | Fiscal estimate received |
2021-05-18 | House | Fiscal estimate received |
2021-05-14 | House | Fiscal estimate received |
2021-05-13 | House | Fiscal estimate received |
2021-05-13 | House | Fiscal estimate received |
2021-05-12 | House | Fiscal estimate received |
2021-05-12 | House | Fiscal estimate received |
2021-05-11 | House | Fiscal estimate received |
2021-05-10 | House | Fiscal estimate received |
2021-05-07 | House | Fiscal estimate received |
2021-05-04 | House | Read first time and referred to Committee on Constitution and Ethics |
2021-05-04 | House | Introduced |