WI AB302 | 2017-2018 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 33-20)
Status: Failed on March 28 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-03-28 - Failed to pass pursuant to Senate Joint Resolution 1
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 33-20)
Status: Failed on March 28 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-03-28 - Failed to pass pursuant to Senate Joint Resolution 1
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
An Act to create 45.12 (2m) and 93.43 of the statutes; Relating to: establishing a veteran farmer assistance and outreach program and creating a veteran farmer logotype. (FE)
Title
Establishing a veteran farmer assistance and outreach program and creating a veteran farmer logotype. (FE)
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-03-28 | House | Failed to pass pursuant to Senate Joint Resolution 1 |
2017-11-09 | House | Laid on the table |
2017-11-07 | House | Placed on calendar 11-9-2017 by Committee on Rules |
2017-08-28 | House | Referred to committee on Rules |
2017-08-28 | House | Report passage recommended by Committee on Veterans and Military Affairs, Ayes 15, Noes 0 |
2017-06-22 | House | Executive action taken |
2017-06-08 | House | Public hearing held |
2017-05-25 | House | Fiscal estimate received |
2017-05-08 | House | Fiscal estimate received |
2017-05-08 | House | Read first time and referred to Committee on Veterans and Military Affairs |
2017-05-08 | House | Introduced |
Wisconsin State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://docs.legis.wisconsin.gov/2017/proposals/reg/asm/bill/ab302 |
Text | https://docs.legis.wisconsin.gov/document/proposaltext/2017/REG/AB302.pdf |